This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 01:47:43 (UTC).

KIMBERLY PARK -V- DURAN

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 KIMBERLY PARK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DURAN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1398

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIMBERLY PARK APARTMENTS LP

Defendant

STEPHANIE DURAN

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARD M PALMER

229 N Riverside Ave

Rialto, CA 92376

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170807-0581 $25.00; 170807-0581-CK Reference Number 80758

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 06/22/2017 OF KIMBERLY PARK APARTMENTS LP ORDERED ENTERED 08/04/17; JUDGMENT FOR: KIMBERLY PARK APARTMENTS LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: STEPHANIE DURAN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: STEPHANIE DURAN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; COURT ORDERS CASE UNSEALED; ACTION - COMPLETE; DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON STEPHANIE DURAN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON STEPHANIE DURAN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/01/17 WITH FEES OF $42.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/01/17 WITH FEES OF $42.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON STEPHANIE DURAN; PARTY SERVED ON 07/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $42.50

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON STEPHANIE DURAN; PARTY SERVED ON 07/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $42.50

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND REINSTATE CASE; Disposition: GRANTED

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND REINSTATE CASE; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:05; DAVID R PROULX, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CASS WATTERS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: STEPHANIE DURAN; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; MOTION; KIMBERLY PARK APARTMENTS LP'S MOTION SET ASIDE DISMISSAL IS HEARD.; KIMBERLY PARK APARTMENTS LP'S MOTION SET ASIDE DISMISSAL IS GRANTED.; DISMISSAL ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 06/22/2017 OF KIMBERLY PARK APARTMENTS LP IS ORDERED SET-ASIDE, THE CASE AND PARTIES ARE SET BACK TO ACTIVE STATUS.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION

DECLARATION RE: TELEPHONIC NOTICE FILED BY KIMBERLY PARK APARTMENTS LP

DECLARATION RE: TELEPHONIC NOTICE FILED BY KIMBERLY PARK APARTMENTS LP

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SET ASIDE EX PARTE DISMISSAL & REINSTATE CASE TO BE HEARD ON 07/27/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1X.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SET ASIDE EX PARTE DISMISSAL & REINSTATE CASE TO BE HEARD ON 07/27/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1X.; Minutes; Receipt: 170726-0242 $60.00; 170726-0242-CK Reference Number 6752

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170622-0869 $255.00; 170622-0869-CK Reference Number 80515

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • WRIT PLACED IN L&M P/U BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170807-0581 $25.00; 170807-0581-CK Reference Number 80758

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 06/22/2017 OF KIMBERLY PARK APARTMENTS LP ORDERED ENTERED 08/04/17; JUDGMENT FOR: KIMBERLY PARK APARTMENTS LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: STEPHANIE DURAN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: STEPHANIE DURAN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; COURT ORDERS CASE UNSEALED; ACTION - COMPLETE; DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON STEPHANIE DURAN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/22/2017 OF KIMBERLY PARK APARTMENTS LP AS TO STEPHANIE DURAN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: TELEPHONIC NOTICE FILED BY KIMBERLY PARK APARTMENTS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SET ASIDE EX PARTE DISMISSAL & REINSTATE CASE TO BE HEARD ON 07/27/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1X.; Minutes; Receipt: 170726-0242 $60.00; 170726-0242-CK Reference Number 6752

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • THE COURT ORDERS THE CASE SEALED/CONFIDENTIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $22.10.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,326.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170622-0869 $255.00; 170622-0869-CK Reference Number 80515

    Read MoreRead Less