Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 08:51:42 (UTC).

KIMBERLY ANN SMITH -V- CITY OF UPLAND

Case Summary

On 09/03/2015 KIMBERLY ANN SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF UPLAND. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2771

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIMBERLY ANN SMITH

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CITY OF UPLAND

CLS LANDSCAPE MANAGEMENT, INC

VALLEYCREST LANSCAPE MAINTENANCE, INC

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES,INC

WEST COAST ARBORIST, INC

CLS LANDSCAPE MANAGEMENT, INC.

ROES 1 THROUGH 20,INCLUSIVE

WEST COAST ARBORISTS, INC.

CLS LANDSCAPE MANAGEMENT,INC.

MOES 1 THROUGH 20

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES,INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SANFORD JOSSEN

136 Main Street Suite E

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

RIPPETOE LAW PC

2 Park Place Suite 525

Irivine, CA 92614

FORTIN LAW GROUP

130 Newport Center Dr., Suite 136

Newport Beach, CA 92660

WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN LLP

9333 Fairway View Place Suite 200

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

KRAMER, DEBOER & KEANE

21860 Burbank Boulevard Suite 370

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

BURNHAM BROWN A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATIO

Po Box 119

Oakland, CA 94604

WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN

21804 Cactus Avet Suite 200

Riverside, CA 92518

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FILED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FILED.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KIMBERLY ANN SMITH.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KIMBERLY ANN SMITH.

ANSWER FILED BY BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES,INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KRAMER, DEBOER & KEANE.

ANSWER FILED BY BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES,INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KRAMER, DEBOER & KEANE.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 11/09/2017 OF CITY OF UPLAND BY CLS LANDSCAPE MANAGEMENT,INC.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 11/09/2017 OF CITY OF UPLAND BY CLS LANDSCAPE MANAGEMENT,INC.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF REQ FOR DISMISSAL AT TO WEST COAST FILED BY WEST COAST ARBORIST, INC.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF REQ FOR DISMISSAL AT TO WEST COAST FILED BY WEST COAST ARBORIST, INC.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CLS LANDSCAPE MANAGEMENT, INC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CLS LANDSCAPE MANAGEMENT, INC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY WEST COAST ARBORIST, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BURNHAM BROWN A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATIO.

ANSWER FILED BY WEST COAST ARBORIST, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BURNHAM BROWN A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATIO.

NOTICE ENTRY OF ORDER 2/16/17 FILED BY CITY OF UPLAND.

NOTICE ENTRY OF ORDER 2/16/17 FILED BY CITY OF UPLAND.

ORDER TO VACATE VOLUNTARY MEDIATION, TSC AND TRIAL DATE FILED

ORDER TO VACATE VOLUNTARY MEDIATION, TSC AND TRIAL DATE FILED; Minutes; VACATE VCMS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/14/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34.; VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/01/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/05/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 04/18/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S32

STIPULATION RE: VACATE TRIAL DATE AND SET TRIAL SETTING FILED.

STIPULATION RE: VACATE TRIAL DATE AND SET TRIAL SETTING FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 01/21/2016 OF CITY OF UPLAND FILED BY CITY OF UPLAND, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 01/21/2016 OF CITY OF UPLAND FILED BY CITY OF UPLAND, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF CITY OF UPLAND, ON 08/22/16

NOTICE OF ATTORNEYS VACATION FILED BY KIMBERLY ANN SMITH.

NOTICE OF ATTORNEYS VACATION FILED BY KIMBERLY ANN SMITH.

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED.

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 01/21/2016 OF CITY OF UPLAND - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 01/21/2016 OF CITY OF UPLAND - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CITY OF UPLAND; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/17/15 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CITY OF UPLAND; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/17/15 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL DUE TO SETTLEMENT FILED 1/22/18; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 09/25/2017 OF BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES,INC FILED BY BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES,INC, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES,INC, ON 05/02/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 11/09/2017 OF CITY OF UPLAND FILED BY CITY OF UPLAND, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF CITY OF UPLAND, ON 05/02/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/13/2017 OF CLS LANDSCAPE MANAGEMENT, INC. FILED BY CLS LANDSCAPE MANAGEMENT, INC., WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF CLS LANDSCAPE MANAGEMENT, INC., ON 05/01/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KIMBERLY ANN SMITH; ATTORNEY KELLY FORTIN VIA TELEPHONICE CONFERENCE 3/7/18 PRESENT FOR DEFT, CITY OF UPLAND.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL CONTACTED DEPARTMENT S32 TO REQUEST A CONTINUANCE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL DUE TO SETTLEMENT FILED 1/22/18 SET FOR 05/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY ATTORNEY KELLY FORTIN.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF KIMBERLY SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CITY OF UPLAND; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/17/15 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY KIMBERLY ANN SMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KIMBERLY ANN SMITH FOR FIRST PAPER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 150903-2780 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLS LANDSCAPE MANAGEMENT,INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WEST COAST ARBORISTS INC. is a litigant