This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/12/2021 at 10:26:30 (UTC).

KHOURY -V- RANCHO MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/29/2015 KHOURY filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against RANCHO MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1287

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEORGE KHOURY

Defendants

RANCHO MOTORCOMPANY, INC ., A CALIFORNIA

JOHN WILKINS

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF CARLIN & BUCHSBAUM, LLP

555 East Ocean Blvd, Ste 818

Long Beach, CA 90802

Defendant Attorney

FISHER & PHILLIPS,LLP

2050 Main Street, Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE

05/02/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE

ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED

08/03/2015: ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED

JOINT STATEMENT SEEKING CONTNCE OF TRL STTNG CONF

07/09/2015: JOINT STATEMENT SEEKING CONTNCE OF TRL STTNG CONF

JOINT STIPULATION TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND PROPO

04/23/2015: JOINT STIPULATION TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND PROPO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON JOHN W

04/09/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON JOHN W

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 150129-100

01/29/2015: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 150129-100

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: HEARING RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketHearing Re:; Original Type: Hearing Re:; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: HEARING RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: HEARING RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketHearing Re:; Original Type: Hearing Re:; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: HEARING RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketCase Transferred to New Department; Comment: CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketDefault Department Changed; Comment: DEFAULT DPT. CHANGED FROM DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM S36 TO S33J. TO .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketCase Transferred to New Department; Comment: CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketVacate Hearing Scheduled; Comment: VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/06/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JOHN WILKINS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/27/15 WITH COSTS OF $89.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20150129-1000; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $1,325.00; Total Payments and Credits: $1,325.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 150129-1000-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 150129-1000-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 12579

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RANCHO MOTOR COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where CONV is a litigant