Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 15:36:24 (UTC).

KEVIN CARSON VS JEANNETTE RIOS-CARSON

Case Summary

On 07/15/2016 KEVIN CARSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JEANNETTE RIOS-CARSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2058

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEVIN CARSON

Claimant

COSTCO 401(K) RETIREMENT PLAN

Respondent

JEANNETTE RIOS-CARSON

Other

THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEVINSON, MARK L

10573 West Pico Blvd #239

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Claimant Attorney

COSTCO WHOLESALE

999 Lake Drive

Issaquah, WA 98027

Respondent Attorney

HILKE, JANIS L

14350 Civic Drive Suite 150

Victorville, CA 92392

Other Attorney

DEPT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

15400 Civic Drive

Victorville, CA 92392

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • HEARING RE: JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180822-0562 $3.00; 180822-0562-VS Reference Number 031-0139990204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; SUSAN F SLATER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: EBONY SHAW; NOT REPORTED; BAILIFF: C MORRIS; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (FL); JUDICIAL ASSISTANT SPOKE WITH ATTONEY HILKES OFFICE AND INFORMED THAT A STIPULATION BY BOTH; COUNSEL WAS MADE TO HAVE THE MATTER SET FOR JUDICAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/28/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT V14.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 07/13/2018 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180710-0502 $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • TERMINATION OF IWO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JEANNETTE RIOS-CARSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • HEARING RE: COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL BISHAY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: EILEEN CHRISTIANSEN; COURT REPORTER WENDY LUCERO 11855; BAILIFF: B SALDANA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JANIS HILKE FOR MARK LEVINSON.; ATTORNEY JANIS HILKE PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KEVIN CARSON, JEANNETTE RIOS-CARSON; PROCEEDINGS:; OSC/MOTION HELD.; ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY JANIS HILKE.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PER STIPULATED REQUEST BY JANIS HILKE; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • HEARING RE: RFO BY KEVIN CARSON 01/12/18 RE S/S; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; MICHAEL BISHAY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: EILEEN CHRISTIANSEN; COURT REPORTER WENDY LUCERO 11855; BAILIFF: B SALDANA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JANIS HILKE FOR MARK LEVINSON.; ATTORNEY JANIS HILKE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KEVIN CARSON, JEANNETTE RIOS-CARSON; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY JANIS HILKE.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PER STIPULATED AGREEMENT OF PARTIES; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
140 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMNS/PET/UCCJEA/DEC OF DISC/PROP DEC/RFO FILED AS TO JEANNETTE RIOS-CARSON. PARTY SERVED ON 07/25/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF KEVIN CARSON IS DEN.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY KEVIN CARSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF KEVIN CARSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V14

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO COMPANIES INC. is a litigant