This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 22:12:38 (UTC).

KENNETH G PATRICK

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 KENNETH G PATRICK was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1080

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARTHA J MORGAN LUNSFORD

Decedent

KENNETH G PATRICK

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 04/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT CLARIFYING CREDITORS CLAIM FILED.

VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT CLARIFYING CREDITORS CLAIM FILED.

PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

HRG OF 04/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/21/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/21/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/21/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/21/18 - PROBATE NOTES

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY VERIZON WIRELESS. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $311.60.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY VERIZON WIRELESS. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $311.60.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY DISCOVER BANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,250.66.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY DISCOVER BANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,250.66.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $2,356.00.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $2,356.00.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK SAMS CLUB MC. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $1,860.00.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK SAMS CLUB MC. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $1,860.00.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK LOWES. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $1,083.10.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK LOWES. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $1,083.10.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY (IMAGED)

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY (IMAGED)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GEORGE THEIOS PRESENT FOR PETITIONER MARTHA J MORGAN LUNSFORD.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF THE COURT.; REASON: CLEAR PROBATE NOTES; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/10/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • HRG OF 07/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • REJECTION OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF CAPITAL ONE FILED ON 12/11/17 IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,860.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • REJECTION OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF DCM SERVICES FILED ON 12/11/17 IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,083.10 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • REJECTION OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF DCM SERVICES FILED ON 02/05/18 IN THE AMOUNT OF $311.60 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • REJECTION OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF CAPITAL ONE FILED ON 12/12/17 IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,356.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • REJECTION OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF DCM SERVICES FILED ON 12/12/17 IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,250.66 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SEE LIST BY MAIL ON 07/13/18 AS TO BRYAN BLAINE PATRICK, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SEE LIST BY MAIL ON 07/13/18 AS TO MICHELLE PATRICK RANDALL, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY VERIZON WIRELESS. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $311.60.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY DISCOVER BANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,250.66.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $2,356.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK SAMS CLUB MC. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $1,860.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY SYNCHRONY BANK LOWES. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $1,083.10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0691 $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less