This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 16:30:04 (UTC).

KDF HESPERIA V MILLS

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 KDF HESPERIA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MILLS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0684

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KDF HESPERIA II, L.P.

Defendants

VENUS MILLS

KAYLA MILLS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALLACE, EARL R.

16520 Bake Parkway Suite 280

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VENUS MILLS, KAYLA MILLS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VENUS MILLS, KAYLA MILLS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 03/29/2017 OF KDF HESPERIA II, L.P. ORDERED ENTERED 04/19/17; JUDGMENT FOR: KDF HESPERIA II, L.P.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VENUS MILLS, KAYLA MILLS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: VENUS MILLS, KAYLA MILLS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/31/17 WITH FEES OF $95.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/31/17 WITH FEES OF $95.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KAYLA MILLS SERVED ON 03/31/17 WITH COSTS OF $95.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KAYLA MILLS SERVED ON 03/31/17 WITH COSTS OF $95.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON VENUS MILLS; PARTY SERVED ON 03/31/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $95.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON VENUS MILLS; PARTY SERVED ON 03/31/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $95.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170329-0365 $255.00; 170329-0365-CK Reference Number 4565

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170329-0365 $255.00; 170329-0365-CK Reference Number 4565

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • ORIG WRIT AND COPIES MAILED IN SASE TO ATTRNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170420-0507 $25.00; 170420-0507-CK Reference Number 4518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VENUS MILLS, KAYLA MILLS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/29/2017 OF KDF HESPERIA II, L.P. AS TO VENUS MILLS, KAYLA MILLS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 03/29/2017 OF KDF HESPERIA II, L.P. ORDERED ENTERED 04/19/17; JUDGMENT FOR: KDF HESPERIA II, L.P.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VENUS MILLS, KAYLA MILLS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: VENUS MILLS, KAYLA MILLS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/31/17 WITH FEES OF $95.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/29/2017 OF KDF HESPERIA II, L.P., ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO KAYLA MILLS SERVED ON 03/31/17 WITH COSTS OF $95.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON VENUS MILLS; PARTY SERVED ON 03/31/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $95.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $921.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $30.13.--BEGINNING ON 04/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170329-0365 $255.00; 170329-0365-CK Reference Number 4565

    Read MoreRead Less