This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:12:35 (UTC).

KAYBA -V- FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 KAYBA -V- FORD MOTOR COMPANY was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1407

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREW KAYBA

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEALE & FHIMA LLP

34188 Pacific Coast Highway

Dana Point, CA 92629

Defendant Attorney

GREENBERG TRAUNRIGLLP

1900 University Ave Fifth Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FORD MOTOR COMPANY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/31/17 WITH COSTS OF $39.95 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FORD MOTOR COMPANY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/31/17 WITH COSTS OF $39.95 FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY GREENBERG TRAUNRIGLLP.

ANSWER FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY GREENBERG TRAUNRIGLLP.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE OF MISSING CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SENT.

NOTICE OF MISSING CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT A CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT MUST BE SUBMITTED WITH EVER NEW; FILING. PLEASE SUBMIT AS SOON AS POSSIBLE.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY FOR 1ST APP FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171128-0700 $435.00; 171128-0700-CK Reference Number 122033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY GREENBERG TRAUNRIGLLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FORD MOTOR COMPANY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/31/17 WITH COSTS OF $39.95 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MISSING CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT A CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT MUST BE SUBMITTED WITH EVER NEW; FILING. PLEASE SUBMIT AS SOON AS POSSIBLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ANDREW KAYBA FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANDREW KAYBA FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0796 $435.00; 171030-0796-CK Reference Number D3580549

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less