Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 15:47:36 (UTC).

KATHLEEN L. PETERS -N- EDWARD LEE PETERS

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 KATHLEEN L PETERS -N- EDWARD LEE PETERS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6083

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KATHLEEN L. PETERS

Respondent

EDWARD LEE PETERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SKORETZ, LENITA A

12 Nevada St., Ste C

Redlands, CA 92373

Respondent Attorney

ROBLEDO, LISETH M

1030 Nevada Street, Ste 105

Redlands, CA 92374

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY EDWARD LEE PETERS FOR PRELIMINARY/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY KATHLEEN L. PETERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF IE BY PERSONAL ON 01/31/18 AS TO LISETH ROBLEDO, ESQ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR ORDER (HEARING 1/31/18) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY EDWARD LEE PETERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY EDWARD LEE PETERS RE: SPOUSAL SUPPORT 08-23-17; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CHERYL C KERSEY, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE KAZALUNAS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; BAILIFF: K SUTTON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LENITA SKORETZ PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PETITIONER KATHLEEN L. PETERS PRESENT; ATTORNEY LISETH ROBLEDO PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; RESPONDENT EDWARD LEE PETERS PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF RFO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY EDWARD LEE PETERS RE: SPOUSAL SUPPORT 08-23-17; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CHERYL C KERSEY, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE KAZALUNAS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; BAILIFF: J VILLESCAS; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LISETH ROBLEDO MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; FOR ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL.; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION.; REASON: PETITIONERS COUNSEL ILL.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/31/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S53.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • PETITIONERS SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PET COMMUNITY & QUASI & SEPARATE PROPERTY DEC BY MAIL ON 11/06/17 AS TO LISETH M ROBLEDO, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • DECLARATION OF EDWARD LEE PETERS IN SUPPORT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY EDWARD LEE PETERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY EDWARD LEE PETERS RE: SPOUSAL SUPPORT 08-23-17.; Minutes; Receipt: 170823-0356 $90.00; 170823-0356-CK Reference Number 1986

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/18/2017 OF KATHLEEN PETERS BY EDWARD LEE PETERS FILED. REPRESENTED BY LISETH M ROBLEDO.; Minutes; Receipt: 170809-0300 $435.00; 170809-0300-CK Reference Number 1964

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO DISSO BY MAIL ON 08/08/17 AS TO LENITA SKORETZ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON EDWARD LEE PETERS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170718-0034 $435.00; 170718-0034-CK Reference Number 19706

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S53

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Liseth Maria Robledo