This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 07:36:47 (UTC).

KATHLEEN CANNON-V-JOSIE SPARKS

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 KATHLEEN CANNON-V-JOSIE SPARKS was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1838

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KATHLEEN CANNON

Defendant

JOSIE SPARKS

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO JOSIE SPARKS. PARTY SERVED ON 11/07/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO JOSIE SPARKS. PARTY SERVED ON 11/07/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:09; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KARLA WOODS; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF KATHLEEN CANNON PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; JOSIE SPARKS HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JOSIE SPARKS.; JUDGMENT FOR: KATHLEEN CANNON; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSIE SPARKS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,700.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $90.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,790.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0715 $50.00; 171030-0715-VS Reference Number 026-0075846803

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 12/22/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • RETURN MAIL: NTC OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:09; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KARLA WOODS; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF KATHLEEN CANNON PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; JOSIE SPARKS HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JOSIE SPARKS.; JUDGMENT FOR: KATHLEEN CANNON; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSIE SPARKS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,700.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $90.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,790.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO JOSIE SPARKS. PARTY SERVED ON 11/07/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 026-0075846803

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0715 $50.00; 171030-0715-VS Reference Number 026-0075846803

    Read MoreRead Less