This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 04:19:48 (UTC).

KARAVARDANYAN -V- ROBERTS

Case Summary

On 07/13/2017 KARAVARDANYAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROBERTS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1585

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANT KARAVARDANYAN

Defendants

LLOYD ROBERTS

ROCIO ROBERTS

Other

ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT A KRASNEY

362 West 6Th Street

San Bernardino, CA 92401-1129

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/13/2017 OF GRANT KARAVARDANYAN ORDERED ENTERED 07/26/17; JUDGMENT FOR: GRANT KARAVARDANYAN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROCIO ROBERTS, LLOYD ROBERTS, ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ROCIO ROBERTS, LLOYD ROBERTS, ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ROCIO ROBERTS, LLOYD ROBERTS, ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ROCIO ROBERTS, LLOYD ROBERTS, ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LLOYD ROBERTS; PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LLOYD ROBERTS; PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ROCIO ROBERTS; PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ROCIO ROBERTS; PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/14/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/14/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170713-0036 $255.00; 170713-0036-CK Reference Number 03365

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • COPIES MAILED IN SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GRANT KARAVARDANYAN FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 170727-0639 $25.00; 170727-0639-CK Reference Number 03441

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/05/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/13/2017 OF GRANT KARAVARDANYAN ORDERED ENTERED 07/26/17; JUDGMENT FOR: GRANT KARAVARDANYAN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROCIO ROBERTS, LLOYD ROBERTS, ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ROCIO ROBERTS, LLOYD ROBERTS, ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ROCIO ROBERTS, LLOYD ROBERTS, ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/13/2017 OF GRANT KARAVARDANYAN AS TO ROCIO ROBERTS, LLOYD ROBERTS, ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LLOYD ROBERTS; PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ROCIO ROBERTS; PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/14/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/13/2017 OF GRANT KARAVARDANYAN, ALL UNKOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $2,250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $25.00.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170713-0036 $255.00; 170713-0036-CK Reference Number 03365

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.