This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/26/2019 at 11:05:48 (UTC).

KALEY YERMAN -V- ARDALAN POURTEYMOOR

Case Summary

On 02/06/2015 KALEY YERMAN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ARDALAN POURTEYMOOR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1801

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KALEY YERMAN

Defendant

ARDALAN POURTEYMOOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DAYTON MAGALLANES

10540 Wilshire Blvd Suite 417

Los Angeles, CA 90024

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY KALEY YERMAN.

NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY KALEY YERMAN.

NOTICE OF REQUEST TO TAKE EARLY EVALUATION CONF OFF CAL BASED ON SETTLEMENT OF CASE FILED.

NOTICE OF REQUEST TO TAKE EARLY EVALUATION CONF OFF CAL BASED ON SETTLEMENT OF CASE FILED.

DECLARATION OF ARDALAN POURTEYMOOR RE: 1) NUMBER OF EMPLOYEES FILED

DECLARATION OF ARDALAN POURTEYMOOR RE: 1) NUMBER OF EMPLOYEES FILED

CONFIDENTIAL COVER SHEET AND DECLARATION RE DOCUMENTS FOR STAY AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE

CONFIDENTIAL COVER SHEET AND DECLARATION RE DOCUMENTS FOR STAY AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF APPLICATION FOR STAY BY MAIL ON 05/04/15 AS TO LAW OFFICE OF DAYTON MAGALLANES, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF APPLICATION FOR STAY BY MAIL ON 05/04/15 AS TO LAW OFFICE OF DAYTON MAGALLANES, FILED.

DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR STAY AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 55.54

DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR STAY AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 55.54

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ARDALAN POURTEYMOOR SERVED ON 03/30/15 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ARDALAN POURTEYMOOR SERVED ON 03/30/15 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING FILED - GRANTED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING FILED - GRANTED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2015
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE ALREADY DISMISSED ON 8/19/15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/05/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY KALEY YERMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • HEARING RE: EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/17/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REQUEST TO TAKE EARLY EVALUATION CONF OFF CAL BASED ON SETTLEMENT OF CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2015
  • HEARING RE: FEE WAIVER REQUEST. KALEY YERMAN; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF KALEY YERMAN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; AFTER REVIEW OF THE APPLICATION AND/OR INQUIRY OF THE APPLICANT, THE COURT GRANTS THE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES IN FULL.; CLERK'S OFFICE TO MAIL ORDER TO PLAINTIFF; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF KALEY YERMAN IS DENIED.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY KALEY YERMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.