This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 12:57:46 (UTC).

JULIE SU -V- MOUNTAIN VIEW CAR WASH

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 JULIE SU filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MOUNTAIN VIEW CAR WASH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1949

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JULIE SU, CALIFORNIA STATE LABOR COMMISSION

Defendant

MOUNTAIN VIEW CAR WASH, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELL, DAVID LAWRENCE

320 W. 4Th St Suite 430

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2016
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER MARY ANDERSON 10319; COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT TAKES NOTE THAT A NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT WAS FILED INDICATING THE CASE WOULD BE DISMISSED BY; NOVEMBER 4, 2016. THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE THE COURT DISMISSES THIS MATTER WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER WITH CASE DISMISSAL TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR JULIE SU, CALIFORNIA STATE LABOR COMMISSION ARE WAIVED FOR FAX FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $4.19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JULIE SU, CALIFORNIA STATE LABOR COMMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER MARY ANDERSON 10319; COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN; APPEARANCES:; DAVID BELL APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JULIE SU, CALIFORNIA STATE LABOR COMMISSION.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD; COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THAT HE IS CURRENLTY IN SETTLEMENT TALKS WITH THE DEFENDANT. HE WILL TAKE; HIS DEFAULT IF THE MATTER DOES NOT SETTLE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 09/15/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PARTY MUST BE NAMED EXACTLY AS IN COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MOUNTAIN VIEW CAR WASH, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/11/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR JULIE SU, CALIFORNIA STATE LABOR COMMISSION ARE WAIVED FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less