This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:11:08 (UTC).

JULIA HUDSON -V- NIAGARA BOTTLING LLC

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 JULIA HUDSON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against NIAGARA BOTTLING LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9427

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JULIA HUDSON/JULIAHORN

Defendant

NIAGARA BOTTLING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

, GLEASON & FA VAROTE LLP

4014 Long Beach Blvd. Suite 300

Long Beach, CA 90807

Defendant Attorney

JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

STIPULATION RE: TO SUBMIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION, STAY ACTION FILED.

STIPULATION RE: TO SUBMIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION, STAY ACTION FILED.

ORDER ENTERING STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION, STAY ACTION PENDING ARB COMPLETION FILED

ORDER ENTERING STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION, STAY ACTION PENDING ARB COMPLETION FILED; Minutes; HEARING RE: STATUS OF BINDING ARBITRATION SET FOR 06/13/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL HEARING RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION SET 6/13/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON NIAGARA BOTTLING LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON NIAGARA BOTTLING LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0840 $435.00; 171004-0840-CK Reference Number 157748

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF BINDING ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF BINDING ARBITRATION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA MORALES; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C LEPE; APPEARANCES:; BRANDYN STEDFIELD APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JULIA HUDSON/JULIAHORN.; DOROTHY BLACK APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NIAGARA BOTTLING LLC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: TO COMPLETE BINDING ARBITRATION; IF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS FILED PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING THIS MATTER WILL BE TAKEN OFF; CALENDAR.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF BINDING ARBITRATION SET FOR 01/28/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FILED BY JULIA HUDSON/JULIAHORN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DEFENDANT NIAGARA BOTTLING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NIAGARA BOTTLING LLC FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171116-0323 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NIAGARA BOTTLING LLC FOR STIP FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171116-0325 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF JULIA HUDSON/JULIAHORN FOR NIAGARA BOTTLING LLC, ATTORNEY JACKSON LEWIS P.C. ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: TO SUBMIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION, STAY ACTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ENTERING STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION, STAY ACTION PENDING ARB COMPLETION FILED; Minutes; HEARING RE: STATUS OF BINDING ARBITRATION SET FOR 06/13/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL HEARING RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION SET 6/13/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON NIAGARA BOTTLING LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0840 $435.00; 171004-0840-CK Reference Number 157748

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less