Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 02:29:15 (UTC).

JUAREZ -V- THR CALIFORNIA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 JUAREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THR CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1180

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES ANTHONY JUAREZ

Defendants and Cross Defendants

THR CALIFORNIA LP

INVITATION HOMES LP

CARYN L AYALA

BCH CONSTRUCTION, INC.

NEW LOOK REFINISHING

THR CALIFORNIA L.P.,A DELAWARELIMITED

INVITATION HOMES,L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED

Cross Plaintiffs

INVITATION HOMES, L.P.

THR CALIFORNIA, L.P.

BCH CONSTRUCTION,INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALAMATI, SEAN F.

888 South Figueroa Street Suite 1030

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST.JOHN LLP

7676 Hazard Center Drive Suite 900-C

San Diego, CA 92108

KENNEDY & SOUZA, APC

7964 Arjons Drive Suite I

San Diego, CA 92126

KIMBALL, TIREY, & ST JOHN LLP

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

ASHTON, HELAINE S

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: OF SERVICE FILED BY BCH CONSTRUCTION, INC.

DECLARATION RE: OF SERVICE FILED BY BCH CONSTRUCTION, INC.

DECLARATION RE: OF SERVICE FILED BY BCH CONSTRUCTION, INC.

DECLARATION RE: OF SERVICE FILED BY BCH CONSTRUCTION, INC.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JAMES JUAREZ FILED BY JAMES ANTHONY JUAREZ, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JAMES JUAREZ FILED BY JAMES ANTHONY JUAREZ, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF JAMES ANTHONY JUAREZ, ON 04/30/18

ORDER COMPELLING PLA FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FILED

ORDER COMPELLING PLA FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FILED

DECLARATION OF ABEL ORTIZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FILED

DECLARATION OF ABEL ORTIZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FILED

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FILED.

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO ANSWER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/24/17, FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT BCH CONSTRUCTION, INC. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO ANSWER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/24/17, FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT BCH CONSTRUCTION, INC. (IMAGED)

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY THR CALIFORNIA, L.P., INVITATION HOMES, L.P..

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY THR CALIFORNIA, L.P., INVITATION HOMES, L.P..

MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO XDEF BCH CONSTRUCTIONS ANSWER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/24/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF THR CALIFORNIA, L.P., INVITATION HOMES, L.P. (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO XDEF BCH CONSTRUCTIONS ANSWER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/24/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF THR CALIFORNIA, L.P., INVITATION HOMES, L.P. (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RULING ON NOVEMBER 7, 2016 HEARING FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON NOVEMBER 7, 2016 HEARING FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THR CALIFORNIA LP, INVITATION HOMES LP.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THR CALIFORNIA LP, INVITATION HOMES LP.

ANSWER FILED BY BCH CONSTRUCTION, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KENNEDY & SOUZA, APC.

ANSWER FILED BY BCH CONSTRUCTION, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KENNEDY & SOUZA, APC.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY JAMES ANTHONY JUAREZ.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY JAMES ANTHONY JUAREZ.

DEMURRER FILED BY THR CALIFORNIA LP, INVITATION HOMES LP, CARYN L AYALA; REPRESENTED BY KIMBALL, TIREY & ST.JOHN LLP(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY THR CALIFORNIA LP, INVITATION HOMES LP, CARYN L AYALA; REPRESENTED BY KIMBALL, TIREY & ST.JOHN LLP(IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER OSC RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLED); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JAMES JUAREZ FILED BY JAMES ANTHONY JUAREZ, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF JAMES ANTHONY JUAREZ, ON 04/30/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 09/12/2016 OF BCH CONSTRUCTION,INC FILED BY BCH CONSTRUCTION, INC., WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF BCH CONSTRUCTION, INC., ON 04/30/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY ROBERT MORRIS FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; ATTORNEY TODD PEARSALL APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BCH CONSTRUCTION, INC..; KIMBALL, TIREY & ST.JOHN LLP FOR THR CALIFORNIA LP, INVITATION HOMES LP NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PARTIES.; REASON: MATTER HAS SETTLED AND COUNSEL NEEDS ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESOLVE LIENS.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: FURTHER OSC RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLED) SET FOR 05/02/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JAMES ANTHONY JUAREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 2 TO BE NEW LOOK REFINISHING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2015
  • DEFENDANT THR CALIFORNIA LP, INVITATION HOMES LP, CARYN L AYALA FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY THR CALIFORNIA LP FOR FAX FILING, COURT REPORTER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 151013-0338 $46.00; 151013-0338-VS Reference Number 023-0239700776

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY THR CALIFORNIA LP, INVITATION HOMES LP, CARYN L AYALA FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 151013-0330 $1,305.00; 151013-0330-VS Reference Number 023-0239700776

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THR CALIFORNIA LP; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/11/15 WITH COSTS OF $95.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 150804-3377 $435.00; 150804-3377-CK Reference Number #21623

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THR CALIFORNIA LP is a litigant

Latest cases where INVITATION HOMES is a litigant