This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 10:52:58 (UTC).

JUAREZ -V- BOTEO

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 JUAREZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BOTEO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0789

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENNY G JUAREZ

Defendant

MARTA JULIA BOTEO

Other

JAIRO MARLENE BOTEO

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CLAIM OF POSSESSION HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

CLAIM OF POSSESSION HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:23; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF BENNY G JUAREZ PRESENT; DEFENDANT JAIRO MARLENE BOTEO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; JAIRO MARLENE BOTEO'S MOTION CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION IS HEARD.; WITNESS -- BENNY JUAREZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- JAIRO BOTEO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; OSCAR BOTEO IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; COURT FINDS:; COURT FINDS THAT CLAIMANT DOES NOT HAVE A VALID CLAIM OF POSSESSION. COURT ORDERS LEVYING OFFICER TO PROCEED W/ ENFORCEMENT OF ORIGINAL WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY. LEVYING OFFICER MAY ENFORCE; THE WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY AGAINST ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS IMMEDIATE POSSESSION.; CLERKS OFFICE TO NOTIFY THE SHERIFF; 08:36; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

HEARING RE: FEE WAIVER REQUEST. COURT FEES AS TO BENNY JUAREZ; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

HEARING RE: FEE WAIVER REQUEST. COURT FEES AS TO BENNY JUAREZ; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:31; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF BENNY G JUAREZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; IN-CAMERA HEARING HELD.; WITNESS -- BENNY JUAREZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; AFTER REVIEW OF THE APPLICATION AND/OR INQUIRY OF THE APPLICANT, THE COURT PARTIALLY GRANTS THE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES, SEE ORDER IN FILE FOR SPECIFIC FEES THAT ARE WAIVED.; APPLICANT SHALL PAY ALL FEES THAT ARE NOT WAIVED WITHIN 10 DAYS OF RECEIVING NOTICE.; PLAINTIFF IS TO PAY $50.00 OF THE FILING FEE BY 2/17/2016; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; 08:33; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER); Minutes; Receipt: 160510-0792 $25.00; 160510-0792-CS Reference Number 25

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FWD TO SHERIFFS DEPT)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FWD TO SHERIFFS DEPT)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING FILED - DENIED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING FILED - DENIED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/01/2016 OF BENNY JUAREZ ORDERED ENTERED 03/30/16; JUDGMENT FOR: BENNY G JUAREZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARTA JULIA BOTEO; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MARTA JULIA BOTEO. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARTA JULIA BOTEO; PARTY SERVED ON 02/02/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARTA JULIA BOTEO; PARTY SERVED ON 02/02/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2026
  • *****PLEASE SEE SHOW NOTES*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • BANK RTN CK CLOSED ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • $25 + $40 NSF FEE =$65 TOTAL DUE BY 6/12/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • ** VOID ** FEE FOR WRIT ISSUED AB145

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER); Minutes; Receipt: 160510-0792 $25.00; 160510-0792-CS Reference Number 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DUPLICATE COPY OF RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2016
  • PAYMENT ON FEE WAIVER FOR NEW FILING PAID BY BENNY G JUAREZ IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00.; Minutes; Receipt: 160217-0065 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING RE: FEE WAIVER REQUEST. COURT FEES AS TO BENNY JUAREZ; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:31; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF BENNY G JUAREZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; IN-CAMERA HEARING HELD.; WITNESS -- BENNY JUAREZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; AFTER REVIEW OF THE APPLICATION AND/OR INQUIRY OF THE APPLICANT, THE COURT PARTIALLY GRANTS THE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES, SEE ORDER IN FILE FOR SPECIFIC FEES THAT ARE WAIVED.; APPLICANT SHALL PAY ALL FEES THAT ARE NOT WAIVED WITHIN 10 DAYS OF RECEIVING NOTICE.; PLAINTIFF IS TO PAY $50.00 OF THE FILING FEE BY 2/17/2016; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; 08:33; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF BENNY G JUAREZ IS DENIED.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • COURT ORDERS A HEARING REGARDING FEE WAIVER FOR BENNY G JUAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY BENNY G JUAREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $900.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less