This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 13:01:05 (UTC).

JOSHUA POWELL -N- ASHLEY POWELL

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 JOSHUA POWELL -N- ASHLEY POWELL was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0601

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOSHUA POWELL

Respondent

ASHLEY POWELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KNOCHEL LAW OFFICES

1967 Highway 95

Bullhead City, AZ 86442

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2018
  • FAXED PROOF SVC SUMMONS/NAR/POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF FL115/FL117 BY MAIL ON 03/20/18 AS TO ASHLEY POWELL, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/PETITION FILED AS TO ASHLEY POWELL. PARTY SERVED ON 03/13/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NAR/MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS/PETITION BY ASHLEY POWELL WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 03/13/18 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOSHUA POWELL FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 180323-0383 $7.21; 180323-0383-VS Reference Number 031-0097227263

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOSHUA POWELL RE: CHILD CUSTODY/CHILD VISITATION; Disposition: Dismissed; Minutes; JOHN W BURDICK, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; COURT REPORTER NUMIA FATA 12678; BAILIFF: S ANDREWS; RONALD DOWDY APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JOSHUA POWELL.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOSHUA POWELL, ASHLEY POWELL; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; ATTORNEY DOWDY ORALLY STIPULATES TO COMMISSIONER; BURDICK; UPON REPRESENTATION OF COUNSEL, PETITIONER; WISHES TO WITHDRAW THE REQUEST FOR ORDER.; THE TEMPORARY ORDERS MADE ON 10/10/17 ARE HEREBY VACATED.; REQUEST FOR ORDER DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180228-0183 $24.21; 180228-0183-VS Reference Number 026-0096047163

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • PETITIONERS ATTORNEYS REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED FL100,FL311,FL341D,FL160,FL161,FL679 BY MAIL ON 02/26/18 AS TO ASHLEY POWELL, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN OF JOSHUA POWELL AMENDED PETITION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2017
  • EX-PARTE RFO RE: CC/CV/PROPERTY CONTROL FILED BY JOSHUA POWELL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOEL AGRON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: NADINE GOLDEN; MATTER NOT REPORTED OR ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOSHUA POWELL, ASHLEY POWELL; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; IN-CAMERA HEARING HELD.; EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; EX PARTE ORDERS GRANTED; EX PARTE ORDER SIGNED BY THE COURT.; REFERRED; REFERRED TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES.; THE PARTIES ARE ORDERED TO REPORT FORTHWITH TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES AND TO COOPERATE FULLY WITH THE CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELOR DURING ALL STAGES OF THE MEDIATION/EVALUATION.; PROCESS. CUSTODIAL PARENT(S) SHALL MAKE CHILDREN AVAILABLE AT ALL TIMES REQUESTED BY COUNSELOR.; SEE FCS CLERK FOR APPOINTMENT; HEARINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOSHUA POWELL RE: CC/CV/ RECEIPT OF FCS REPORT IS SET FOR 11/07/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT M4.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PETITIONER AND ATTORNEYS REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DECLARATION RE NOTICE AND SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY EMERGENCY ORDER FILED BY JOSHUA POWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DECLARATION OF SUPERVISED VISITATION PROVIDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DECLARATION OF SUPERVISED VISITATION PROVIDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less