This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/28/2018 at 11:33:46 (UTC).

JOSEPH ROMULO APOLO LOPEZ,ETAL -V- JESSICA UHL,ETA

Case Summary

On 03/16/2010 JOSEPH ROMULO APOLO LOPEZ,ETAL filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against JESSICA UHL,ETA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2687

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARILYN REYES LOPEZ

JOSEPH ROMULOAPOLO LOPEZ

Defendants

JAMES M LALLY DO

STEVEN DAVIS D.O

VIA VERDE MEDICAL GROUP, INC

PRIME HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, INC

SATISH CHOUDHARY MD

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE OF INLAND EMPIRE

JESSICA A UHL PA

VERITAS HEALTH SERVICES, INC

CHAD L CLARK MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIBERATION LAW GROUP, P.C.

2760 Mission St

San Francisco, CA 94110

Defendant Attorneys

DAVIS, GRASS, GOLDSTEIN & HOUSOUER

3105 Sedona Court

Ontario, CA 91764

GERISCH, ALFRED W

865 S. Figueora St.,32Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5431

DAVIS, GRASS, GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY

3105 Sedona Court

Ontario, CA 91764

DOYLE & SCHAFER, LLP

100 Spectrum Center Drive Ste 520

Irvine, CA 92618

FARMER CASE HACK &FEDOR

402 West Broadway Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

CARROLL, KELLY, TROTTER, FRANZEN, MCKENNA &

111 West Ocean Blvd 14Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90801

HULBERT, GREGORY M

111 West Ocean Boulevard 14Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802-4646

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2015
  • VOL 1-11 SENT TO SBJC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (AFTER SETTLEMENT); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • $6650.85 REPORTER FEES EXPENSED TO THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • VACATE OSCX HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • $5860.96 JURY FEES EXPENSED TO THE COURT FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • ALL PARTIES DISPOSITIONED, CASE DISPOSITIONED; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT AFTER JURY TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION DISMISSAL AFTER JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CHAD L CLARK MD, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED BY CHAD L CLARK MD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (AFTER SETTLEMENT); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE BRIGUGLIO; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY KELLY (BY PHONE ON 2/17/15) PRESENT FOR CHAD CLARK MD.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF ATTORNEY KELLY.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/17/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY ATTORNEY KELLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
424 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2010
  • ANSWER FILED BY JESSICA A UHL PA, STEVEN DAVIS D.O, VIA VERDE MEDICAL GROUP, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ALFRED W GERISCH.; Minutes; Receipt: 100518-2047 $1,065.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NEEDS TO BE ATTACHED TO PROOF OF SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • ANSWER FILED BY JAMES M LALLY DO, VERITAS HEALTH SERVICES, INC, PRIME HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DAVIS, GRASS, GOLDSTEIN & HOUSOUER.; Minutes; Receipt: 100413-3580 $1,065.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/16/2010 OF JOSEPH LOPEZ, SATISH CHOUDHARY MD, VERITAS HEALTH SERVICES, INC, PRIME HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, INC, AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE OF INLAND EMPIRE IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/16/2010 OF JOSEPH LOPEZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100316-3236 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.