This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 01:10:05 (UTC).

JOSEPH ISKANDER -N- NASREEN JAMEEL ISKANDER

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 JOSEPH ISKANDER -N- NASREEN JAMEEL ISKANDER was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8357

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOSEPH ISKANDER

Respondent

NASREEN JAMEEL ISKANDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ANGELIQUE G BONANNO

8291 Utica Avenue Suite 200

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2017
  • PARTY JOSEPH ISKANDER UPDATED: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED. LAW OFFICES OF ANGELIQUE G BONANNO WITHDRAWS AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD. JOSEPH ISKANDER IS NOW REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 03/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF JOSEPH ISKANDER FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF JOSEPH ISKANDER ORDERED ENTERED 10/12/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON NASREEN JAMEEL ISKANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • APPEARANCE STIPULATION WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY NASREEN JAMEEL ISKANDER FOR PRELIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY NASREEN JAMEEL ISKANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO DISSO/IE/DEC OF DISCL RE SRVC BY PERSONAL ON 09/28/17 AS TO ANGELIQUE G. BONANNO, ATTY FOR PET, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF JOSEPH ISKANDER BY NASREEN JAMEEL ISKANDER FILED. REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0469 $435.00; 171004-0469-CK Reference Number 679

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JOSEPH ISKANDER FOR PRELIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON NASREEN JAMEEL ISKANDER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/28/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JOSEPH ISKANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0457 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S47

    Read MoreRead Less