This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 04:15:37 (UTC).

JOSEPH GRANT V AMY GRANT

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 JOSEPH GRANT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against AMY GRANT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1558

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSEPH GRANT

Defendant

AMY GRANT

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON AMY GRANT; PARTY SERVED ON 07/13/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $80.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON AMY GRANT; PARTY SERVED ON 07/13/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $80.00

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0551 $255.00

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF JOSEPH GRANT ORDERED ENTERED 07/25/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JOSEPH GRANT; JUDGMENT AGAINST: AMY GRANT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: AMY GRANT. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON AMY GRANT.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON AMY GRANT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/05/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • WRIT FWD TO SCS THIS DATE,COPIES MAILED IN SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170725-0363 $25.00; 170725-0363-CK Reference Number 2664

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON AMY GRANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF JOSEPH GRANT AS TO AMY GRANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF JOSEPH GRANT ORDERED ENTERED 07/25/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JOSEPH GRANT; JUDGMENT AGAINST: AMY GRANT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: AMY GRANT. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON AMY GRANT; PARTY SERVED ON 07/13/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF UD FILING RECEIVED BACK FROM ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: UD FILING RECEIVED BACK FROM AMY GRANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOSEPH GRANT FOR 1ST PAPER FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0640 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • ** VOID ** LIMITED UNLAWFUL DET FEE UP TO 10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0551 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less