This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 12:45:05 (UTC).

JOSEPH DALE ARCHAMBO

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 JOSEPH DALE ARCHAMBO was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0087

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TIMOTHY DALE ARCHAMBO

Decedent

JOSEPH DALE ARCHAMBO

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADM W/FULL IAEA FILED BY TIMOTHY DALE ARCHAMBO(PROBATE).

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADM W/FULL IAEA FILED BY TIMOTHY DALE ARCHAMBO(PROBATE).

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TIMOTHY DALE ARCHAMBO

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TIMOTHY DALE ARCHAMBO

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • FIRST AND FINAL REPORT ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF TIMOTHY DALE ARCHAMBO AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BERL H. SELSKI APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR TIMOTHY DALE ARCHAMBO.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 09/10/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • HRG OF 08/28/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 08/28/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • HRG OF 08/28/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • VACATE PRARV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/27/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON TIMOTHY DALE ARCHAMBO FOR FIRST AND FINAL ACCT IN THE AMOUNT OF $465.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCT RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TIMOTHY DALE ARCHAMBO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY TIMOTHY DALE ARCHAMBO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY TIMOTHY DALE ARCHAMBO IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON TIMOTHY DALE ARCHAMBO FOR PETITION AND PETITION FOR SPECIAL IN THE AMOUNT OF $555.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.