This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 01:01:51 (UTC).

JOSEPH CRUPI-N-ANGELA CRUPI

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 JOSEPH CRUPI-N-ANGELA CRUPI was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0614

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOSEPH ROY CRUPI

Respondent

ANGELA MIA CRUPI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 06/15/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • NOTICE/JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/14/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF JOSEPH CRUPI FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF JOSEPH CRUPI ORDERED ENTERED 04/26/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ANGELA MIA CRUPI FOR PRELIMINARY/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT WAS RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: MISSING DOCUMENT. RESPONDENT MUST AT LEAST FILE; A FL-141 PRELIMINARY. PLEASE RESUBMIT WITH RESPONDENTS FL-141.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON ANGELA MIA CRUPI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ANGELA MIA CRUPI FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF JOSEPH CRUPI AS TO ANGELA MIA CRUPI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JOSEPH ROY CRUPI FOR PRELIM/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ANGELA MIA CRUPI; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/14/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF JOSEPH ROY CRUPI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0277 $441.50

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.