This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 20:06:27 (UTC).

JOSEHINE MARIN -N- JAIME CARRILLO

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 JOSEHINE MARIN -N- JAIME CARRILLO was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1980

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOSEPHINE MARIN

Respondent

JAIME CARRILLO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 09/17/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 03/09/2017 OF JOSEPHINE MARIN FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 03/09/2017 OF JOSEPHINE MARIN ORDERED ENTERED 05/05/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON JAIME CARRILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JOSEPHINE MARIN FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JAIME CARRILLO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 03/09/2017 OF JOSEPHINE MARIN AS TO JAIME CARRILLO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JAIME CARRILLO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/16/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • VACATE SPOS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JOSEPHINE MARIN IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JOSEPHINE MARIN FOR FIRST APP FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF JOSEPHINE MARIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JOSEPHINE MARIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S55

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.