This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/09/2021 at 13:34:38 (UTC).

JOSE MARTINEZ, ET AL -V- JOHNSON CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 JOSE MARTINEZ, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JOHNSON CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCarville, Brian S, Poncin, Lynn and Arreola, Rafael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0358

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCarville, Brian S

Poncin, Lynn

Arreola, Rafael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARTINEZ, JOSE

GUTIERREZ MARTINEZ, MAYRA GONZALEZ

MARTINEZ, KEVIN JESUS

MARTINEZ, MAYRA LILIANA

MARTINEZ, MIA SOFIA

Not Yet Classified and Defendants

Colonial Electric, Inc

JOHNSON CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT, INC

KING EQUIPMENT, LLC

SKYJACK, INC

SKYJACK EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC

Roes 1 through 20

Roes 1 to 50

CONV

Minors and Plaintiffs

MARTINEZ, KEVIN JESUS

MARTINEZ, MAYRA LILIANA

MARTINEZ, MIA SOFIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

CUTTER LAW PC

Not Yet Classified and Defendant Attorneys

Law Offices of Anthony T Schneider

LAW OFFICE OF CRAIG A HOLTZ

Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

THEODORA ORINGHER PC

WHEELER TRIGG O'DONNELL LLP

 

Court Documents

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

10/27/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Notice of Ruling Filed

09/01/2021: Notice of Ruling Filed

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

08/31/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

**CV - Portal Minute Order

08/25/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

At-Issue Memorandum Filed

08/11/2021: At-Issue Memorandum Filed

Answer Filed

06/18/2021: Answer Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

06/18/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

At-Issue Memorandum Filed

06/02/2021: At-Issue Memorandum Filed

Order Filed Re:

05/27/2021: Order Filed Re:

Order Filed Re:

05/27/2021: Order Filed Re:

Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed

05/26/2021: Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed

Declaration Filed

04/15/2021: Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed

04/15/2021: Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed

04/15/2021: Declaration Filed

Application for Order Filed re:

04/15/2021: Application for Order Filed re:

**CV - Portal Minute Order

02/18/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Declaration Filed

02/11/2021: Declaration Filed

Application for Order Filed re:

02/11/2021: Application for Order Filed re:

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Request for dismissal as to Skyjack Equipment Services, Inc and Skyjack, Inc: Previously dismissed per order signed 05/27/21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling Filed; Comment: Notice of Ruling filed by defendant and cross complaintiff Colonial Electric, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Defendant; Comment: With prejudice. Filed by All Plaintiffs on complaint filed 10/09/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum Filed; Comment: filed by all plaintiffs on amended complaint filed 5/29/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed; Comment: to 1st Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration re:; Comment: DECLARATION RE: ROUSSAS IS APP FOR GAL OF MAYRA LILIANA MARTINEZ FILED BY JOSE MARTINEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration re:; Comment: DECLARATION RE: ROUSSAS ISO APP FOR GAL OF MIA SOFIA MARTINEZ FILED BY JOSE MARTINEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration re:; Comment: DECLARATION RE: ROUSSAS ISO APP FOR GAL OF KEVIN JESUS MARTINEZ FILED BY JOSE MARTINEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketParty Added; Comment: ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JOSE MARTINEZ, KING EQUIPMENT, LLC, SKYJACK EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC. IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketAdvanced Jury Fees Posted; Comment: ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR COLONIAL ELECTRIC,INC.. 191211-0808-CK JFN/ 150.00 PAYMT 191211-0808-CK REFERENCE NUMBER #13497

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketDefendant First Paper Fee Paid in Full; Comment: DEFENDANT COLONIAL ELECTRIC,INC. FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY COLONIAL ELECTRIC,INC. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES 191211-0804-CK CVT/ 435.00 PAYMT 191211-0804-CK REFERENCE NUMBER #13497

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketParty Added; Comment: ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JOSE MARTINEZ, COLONIAL ELECTRIC,INC. IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketParty Added; Comment: ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JOSE MARTINEZ, MAYRA GONZALEZ GUTIERREZ MARTINEZ, KEVIN JESUS MARTINEZ, MAYRA LILIANA MARTINEZ, MIA SOFIA MARTINEZ IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF & MINOR PLAINTIFF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less