This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 14:39:16 (UTC).

JOSE MANUEL FAJARDO -N- FLOR MARIA FAJARDO

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 JOSE MANUEL FAJARDO -N- FLOR MARIA FAJARDO was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3064

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOSE MANUEL FAJARDO

Respondent

FLOR MARIA FAJARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEVINSON, MARK L

10573 West Pico Blvd #239

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 05/10/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/27/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT VCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • JUDGMENT - STATUS ONLY; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL); CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • JUDGMENT PKT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JOSE MANUEL FAJARDO FOR PRELIM/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • APPEARANCE STIPULATION WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 04/17/18 BY JOSE MANUEL FAJARDO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • JUDGMENT RECD

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JOSE MANUEL FAJARDO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY JOSE MANUEL FAJARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JOSE MANUEL FAJARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOSE MANUEL FAJARDO RE: CHLD CUST;VISIT (092717).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF JOSE MANUEL FAJARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINSON MARK LYNN