This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 03:50:23 (UTC).

JOSE A NAVA -V- SALVADOR ALVAREZ, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/25/2016 JOSE A NAVA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SALVADOR ALVAREZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6223

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSE A NAVA MERCADO

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SALVADOR ALVAREZ

WEST COAST TRANSPORTATION

CG ROXANE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF ESTELA RICHEDA

150 So. El Molino Avenue Suite 100

Pasadena, CA 91101

LAW OFFICE OF R. BRIAN KRAMER

1230 Rosecrans Ave, Suite 300

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HAIGHT, BROWN & BONESTEEL, L.L.P.

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL

2050 Main St Ste 600

Irvine, CA 92614

BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

970 West 190Th Street Suite 700

Torrance, CA 90502

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/27/2016 OF SALVADOR ALVAREZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/27/2016 OF SALVADOR ALVAREZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/27/2016 OF SALVADOR ALVAREZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/27/2016 OF SALVADOR ALVAREZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JOSE NAVA MERCADO

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JOSE NAVA MERCADO

ANSWER FILED BY SALVADOR ALVAREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HAIGHT, BROWN & BONESTEEL, L.L.P..

ANSWER FILED BY SALVADOR ALVAREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HAIGHT, BROWN & BONESTEEL, L.L.P..; Minutes; Receipt: 160524-0762 $435.00; 160524-0762-CK Reference Number 71660

REPLY TO DEF OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES SET FOR HEARING ON 03/26/18 FILED BY CG ROXANE, LLC. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO DEF OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES SET FOR HEARING ON 03/26/18 FILED BY CG ROXANE, LLC. (IMAGED)

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY SALVADOR ALVAREZ

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY SALVADOR ALVAREZ

ANSWER FILED BY SALVADOR ALVAREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL.

ANSWER FILED BY SALVADOR ALVAREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 03/26/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT WEST COAST TRANSPORTATION, SALVADOR ALVAREZ (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 03/26/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT WEST COAST TRANSPORTATION, SALVADOR ALVAREZ (IMAGED)

ANSWER FILED BY CG ROXANE, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY CG ROXANE, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

NOTICE OF FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY JOSE A NAVA MERCADO.

NOTICE OF FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY JOSE A NAVA MERCADO.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JOSE A NAVA MERCADO.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JOSE A NAVA MERCADO.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/25/2016 OF JOSE NAVA MERCADO BY SALVADOR ALVAREZ, SALVADOR ALVAREZ

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/25/2016 OF JOSE NAVA MERCADO BY SALVADOR ALVAREZ, SALVADOR ALVAREZ

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: FOR ORDR AMENDING THE ORDR ON SJ MTN OF ISSUES; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID 11053; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; LAW OFFICE OF ESTELA RICHEDA FOR JOSE A NAVA MERCADO NOT PRESENT; ATTORNEY HEIDI YOSHIOKA PRESENT FOR CG ROXANE, LLC.; ATTORNEY ANNETTE MIJANOVIC APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SALVADOR ALVAREZ.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; EX PARTE APPLICATION ARGUED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; EX PARTE ORDERS GRANTED AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT.; NO OBJECTION PRESENTED TO THE COURTS MODIFICATION OF THE ORDER.; COUNSEL FOR SALVADOR ALVAREZ TO GIVE NOTICE.; DEFENDANT ALVAREZ IS ORDERED TO PREPARE THE AMENDED PROPOSED ORDER AND TO HAVE THE PROPOSED; ORDER SERVED TO COUNSEL PRIOR TO SUBMITTING TO THE COURT FOR SIGNATURE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 10/10/18 CONFIRMED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE FOR ORDR AMENDING THE ORDR ON SJ MTN OF ISSUES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SALVADOR ALVAREZ FOR EX PARTE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180625-0434 $90.00; 180625-0434-CK Reference Number 124991

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO OF SALVADOR ALVAREZ FOR ORDR FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY OF SALVADOR ALVAREZ TO ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON CG ROXANE LLCS MSJ, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION (BY CG ROXANE, LLC); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ESTELA RICHEDA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JOSE A NAVA MERCADO.; ATTORNEY R. BRIAN KRAMER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY ANNETTE MIJANOVIC PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT SALVADOR ALVAREZ.; ATTORNEY HEIDI YOSHIOKA PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT CG ROXANE LLC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; CG ROXANE, LLC'S MOTION RE: SUMMAY JUDGMENT/SUMMARY ADJUDICATION IS HEARD.; THE COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED THE MOTION, OPPOSITION AND REPLY.; THE COURT RECITES TENTATIVE RULING.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY ATTORNEY HEIDI YOSHIOKA .; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY ATTORNEY ANNETTE MIJANOVIC .; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY ATTORNEY R. BRIAN KRAMER .; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY ATTORNEY ESTELA RICHEDA .; COURT FINDS:; THE COURT ADOPTS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS:; PLAINTIFF JOSE A. NAVA MERCADOS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT, CROSS-DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT; CG ROXANE, LLCS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS, AND SPECIFICALLY, UNDISPUTED FACT NUMBERS; 2, 4, 14 AND 16 ARE OVERRULED IN THEIR ENTIRETY.; DEFENDANTS, CROSS-DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-COMPLAINTS SALVADOR ALVAREZ INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA WEST COAST; TRANSPORTATIONS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT, CROSS-DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT CG ROXANE,; LLCS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS ARE OVERRULED IN ENTIRETY.; DEFENDANT, CROSS-DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT CG ROXANE, LLCS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF JOSE A. NAVA; MERCADOS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS, AND SPECIFICALLY, UNDISPUTED FACT NUMBERS 20-21,; 24-29 AND 31-69 ARE OVERRULED IN THEIR ENTIRETY.; DEFENDANT, CROSS-DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT CG ROXANE, LLCS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS,; CROSS-DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-COMPLAINTS SALVADOR ALVAREZ AND WEST COAST TRANSPORTATIONS SEPARATE; STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS, AND SPECIFICALLY, UNDISPUTED FACT NUMBERS 29-37 AND 39-63 ARE; OVERRULED IN THEIR ENTIRETY.; DEFENDANT, CROSS-DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT CG ROXANE, LLCS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IS; GRANTED IN ITS ENTIRETY AS TO EXHIBITS J-T.; DEFENDANT, CROSS-DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT CG ROXANE, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN; THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BASED UPON THE NON-EXISTENCE OF A DANGEROUS AND UNSAFE; CONDITION IS DENIED.; DEFENDANT, CROSS-DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT CG ROXANE, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN; THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BASED UPON AN ALLEGED LACK OF DUTY IS DENIED.; DEFENDANT, CROSS-DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT CG ROXANE, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS; TO DEFENDANT, CROSS-DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT SALVADOR ALVAREZ VIOLATING HIS; NON-DELEGABLE FEDERAL MOTOR CARRIER SAFETY ACT AND FEDERAL MOTOR CARRIER SAFETY REGULATIONS; DUTIES IS GRANTED.; THE EVIDENCE RELIED UPON BY THE COURT IS RECITED INTO THE RECORD.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT CG ROXANE LLC TO PREPARE ORDER.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ESTELA RICHEDA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JOSE A NAVA MERCADO.; ATTORNEY R. BRIAN KRAMER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY ANNETTE MIJANOVIC PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT SALVADOR ALVAREZ.; ATTORNEY HEIDI YOSHIOKA PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT CG ROXANE LLC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL REPRESENTS PARTIES HAVE PREVIOUSLY ATTENDED MEDIATION; HOWEVER, PARTIES; ARE CONSIDERING ATTENDING PRIVATE MEDIATION IN SEPTEMBER.; COUNSEL ARE ADVISED IF PARTIES WOULD LIKE TO ATTEND A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE,; COUNSEL MAY CONTACT THE JUDICIAL ASSISTANT FOR A DATE OR COUNSEL MAY ALSO CONTACT THE JUDICIAL; ASSISTANT FOR A SOONER FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE DATE IF MEDIATION IS CONDUCTED BEFORE; SEPTEMBER.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/10/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT CG ROXANE LLC TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2016
  • DEFENDANT SALVADOR ALVAREZ FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY SALVADOR ALVAREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HAIGHT, BROWN & BONESTEEL, L.L.P..; Minutes; Receipt: 160524-0762 $435.00; 160524-0762-CK Reference Number 71660

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOSE A NAVA MERCADO FOR FITRS PAPER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 160425-0841 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/25/2016 OF JOSE NAVA MERCADO FOR JOSE A NAVA MERCADO, ATTORNEY LAW OFFICE OF R. BRIAN KRAMER ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.