This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 05:38:37 (UTC).

JONATHAN G GARIBAY -V- SHAVONNA ROBINSON

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 JONATHAN G GARIBAY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHAVONNA ROBINSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1680

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONATHAN G GARIBAY

Defendant

SHAVONNA ROBINSON

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/18/2017 OF JONATHAN GARIBAY ORDERED ENTERED 08/09/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JONATHAN G GARIBAY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SHAVONNA ROBINSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: SHAVONNA ROBINSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/29/17 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/29/17 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SHAVONNA ROBINSON FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SHAVONNA ROBINSON FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SHAVONNA ROBINSON; PARTY SERVED ON 07/29/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SHAVONNA ROBINSON; PARTY SERVED ON 07/29/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JONATHAN G GARIBAY FOR FAX AND COPIES IN THE AMOUNT OF $8.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/18/2017 OF JONATHAN GARIBAY ORDERED ENTERED 08/09/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JONATHAN G GARIBAY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SHAVONNA ROBINSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: SHAVONNA ROBINSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/18/2017 OF JONATHAN GARIBAY AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JONATHAN G GARIBAY FOR FAX IN THE AMOUNT OF $7.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/29/17 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SHAVONNA ROBINSON FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/18/2017 OF JONATHAN GARIBAY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JONATHAN G GARIBAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JONATHAN G GARIBAY IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JONATHAN G GARIBAY FOR FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JONATHAN G GARIBAY FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170720-0367 $21.19; 170720-0367-VS Reference Number 026-0058116832

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.