This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 06:51:29 (UTC).

JON & STACIE MATTHEWS VS RAEL SILVA & RONALD TAVAR

Case Summary

On 03/04/2010 JON STACIE MATTHEWS filed an Other lawsuit against RAEL SILVA RONALD TAVAR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals and Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0016

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

RAEL SILVA

Respondent

JON MATTHEWS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2010
  • DocketREMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: PER CURIUM OPINION FILED ON 10/22/10.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • DocketSTAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • DocketCASE DISPOSITIONED-JUDGEMENT WITH DECISION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2010
  • DocketJUDGMENT WITH OPINION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2010
  • DocketAPPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2010
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: HEARING ON APPEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • DocketNTC OF HEARING ON APPEAL - 10/22/10 1:30 PM S-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2010
  • DocketUPDATE PARTY ADDRESS FOR RAEL SILVA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketNO RESPONDENTS BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketCASE PREPPED FOR OCTOBER APPELLATE CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • DocketRESPONDENTS BRIEF DUE 5/28/10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • DocketLATE LETTER SENT RE: NO RESPONDENT BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • DocketAPPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • DocketRESPONDENTS BRIEF DUE 5/7/10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDUEL FILED. APPELLANTS OPE NING BRIEF DUE 4/5/10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • DocketSUPERIOR COURT #UDVS902498 - VICTORVILLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL FILED CT-1 VOL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less