This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/29/2017 at 07:38:25 (UTC).

JOHNSON-V-SOREMEKUN

Case Summary

On 05/22/2017 JOHNSON-V-SOREMEKUN was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1127

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RANDY JOHNSON

Defendant

ADE SOREMEKUN

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

COURT TRIAL SET FOR UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/22/2017 OF RANDY JOHNSON; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET FOR UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/22/2017 OF RANDY JOHNSON; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:20; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOHN VANNI PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF RANDY JOHNSON PRESENT; DEFENDANT ADE SOREMEKUN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; STPULATED JUDGMENT RECEIVED, SIGNED AND FILED.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT FOR RANDY JOHNSON.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: 08/21/17; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,614.66 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,614.66; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ADE SOREMEKUN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 09/30/17.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; NO NEGATIVE CREDIT REPORTING PURSUANT TO CC 1786.18(A)(4).; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); HEARINGS:; ***SPECIAL SETTING***; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : COMPLIANCE WITH JUDGMENT SET FOR 08/21/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF ADDITIONAL COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ADE SOREMEKUN IS GRANTED (IMAGED)

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF ADDITIONAL COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ADE SOREMEKUN IS GRANTED (IMAGED)

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ADE SOREMEKUN

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ADE SOREMEKUN

ANSWER FILED BY ADE SOREMEKUN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY ADE SOREMEKUN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

MOTION RE: DEMURRER (061917) FILED BY DEFENDANT ADE SOREMEKUN; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

MOTION RE: DEMURRER (061917) FILED BY DEFENDANT ADE SOREMEKUN; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:57; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM GARRETT JR. PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ADE SOREMEKUN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; DEMURRER IS OVERRULED AS TO ADE SOREMEKUN; DEFENDANT HAS 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THE MAILING OF THE NOTICE OF RULING TO ANSWER ONLY.; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/22/2017 OF RANDY JOHNSON IS SET FOR 08/10/17 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY PLAINTIFF.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

DEMURRER FILED BY ADE SOREMEKUN; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY ADE SOREMEKUN; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170615-0747 $25.00; 170615-0747-CK Reference Number 6400

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/22/2017 OF RANDY JOHNSON ORDERED ENTERED 06/15/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/25/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/25/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

MOTION RE: ORDER TO QUASH 3-DAY NTC & SVC OF SUMMONS/COMPLAIN T FILED BY DEFENDANT ADE SOREMEKUN; Disposition: DENIED

MOTION RE: ORDER TO QUASH 3-DAY NTC & SVC OF SUMMONS/COMPLAIN T FILED BY DEFENDANT ADE SOREMEKUN; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:43; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RANDY JOHNSON, ADE SOREMEKUN; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ADE SOREMEKUN'S MOTION ORDER TO QUASH 3-DAY NTC & SERVICE OF SUMMONS IS DENIED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COMPLIANCE WITH JUDGMENT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:46; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RANDY JOHNSON, ADE SOREMEKUN; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT INDICATES BASED ON NO APPEARANCE BY THE PARTIES THAT THE DEFENDANT IS IN COMPLIANCE.; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/22/2017 OF RANDY JOHNSON.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO INDICATION OF NON-COMPLIANCE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/22/2017 OF RANDY JOHNSON; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:20; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOHN VANNI PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF RANDY JOHNSON PRESENT; DEFENDANT ADE SOREMEKUN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; STPULATED JUDGMENT RECEIVED, SIGNED AND FILED.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT FOR RANDY JOHNSON.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: 08/21/17; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,614.66 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,614.66; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ADE SOREMEKUN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 09/30/17.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; NO NEGATIVE CREDIT REPORTING PURSUANT TO CC 1786.18(A)(4).; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); HEARINGS:; ***SPECIAL SETTING***; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : COMPLIANCE WITH JUDGMENT SET FOR 08/21/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/22/2017 OF RANDY JOHNSON AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF ADDITIONAL COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ADE SOREMEKUN IS GRANTED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ADE SOREMEKUN FOR FAX IN THE AMOUNT OF $12.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ADE SOREMEKUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY ADE SOREMEKUN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ADE SOREMEKUN FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ADE SOREMEKUN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: ORDR TO QUASH 3-DAY NTC & SVC OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 06/13/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT ADE SOREMEKUN (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RANDY JOHNSON FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170522-0834 $255.00; 170522-0834-VS Reference Number 026-0044010092

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $950.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $31.66.--BEGINNING ON 06/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.