This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 01:03:55 (UTC).

JOHNSON-V-MACIAS

Case Summary

On 04/12/2016 JOHNSON-V-MACIAS was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5405

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICHELLE JOHNSON

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TUTOR-SALIBA CORPORATION

SILVERIO MACIAS

TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA

MARTINEZ TRUCKING & LOGISTICS,INC.

TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

SILVERIO MACIAS

MARTINEZ TRUCKING & LOGISTICS,INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MILES & HATCHER,LLP

9121 Haven Avenue Suite 290

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CASTLE & ASSOCIATES

8383 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 810

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES

1600 Iowa Avenue Suite 200

Riverside, CA 92507

BECHERER KANNETT &SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell Street

Emeryville, CA 94608

Cross Defendant Attorney

BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell Street

Emeryville, CA 94608

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED; Minutes; ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT SILVERIO MACIAS WITH PREJUDICE.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY TUTOR-SALIBA CORPORATION, TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY TUTOR-SALIBA CORPORATION, TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA.

DECLARATION OF CORNELL L HATCHER FILED

DECLARATION OF CORNELL L HATCHER FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/24/16 WITH COSTS OF $56.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/24/16 WITH COSTS OF $56.00 FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/02/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NICHELLE JOHNSON (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/02/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NICHELLE JOHNSON (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH BY MAIL ON 06/27/16 AS TO SILVERIO MACIAS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH BY MAIL ON 06/27/16 AS TO SILVERIO MACIAS, FILED.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY MARTINEZ TRUCKING &LOGISTICS,INC..

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY MARTINEZ TRUCKING &LOGISTICS,INC..

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SILVERIO MACIAS SERVED ON 05/16/16 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SILVERIO MACIAS SERVED ON 05/16/16 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

NOTICE OF RETURNED CHECK #58503 FOR $435.00 SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURNED CHECK #58503 FOR $435.00 SENT.; Minutes; FIRST APPEARANCE FEES WERE ALREADY PAID FOR DEFENDANT ON 8-23-16 SEE PRINTOUT.

ANSWER FILED BY MARTINEZ TRUCKING &LOGISTICS,INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BECHERER KANNETT &SCHWEITZER.

ANSWER FILED BY MARTINEZ TRUCKING &LOGISTICS,INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BECHERER KANNETT &SCHWEITZER.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/12/2016 OF NICHELLE JOHNSON BY TUTOR-SALIBA CORPORATION, TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/12/2016 OF NICHELLE JOHNSON BY TUTOR-SALIBA CORPORATION, TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA

DECLARATION OF BRENDA MARTINEZ IN SUPPORT OF MSJ FILED

DECLARATION OF BRENDA MARTINEZ IN SUPPORT OF MSJ FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2017
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • MOTION RE: FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTINEZ TRUCKING &LOGISTICS,INC.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0029474705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NICHELLE JOHNSON FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170814-0011 $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/14/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING MSJ OFF CALENDAR FILED BY MARTINEZ TRUCKING &LOGISTICS,INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2016 OF TUTOR-SALIBA CORPORATION FILED BY TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA, TUTOR-SALIBA CORPORATION, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF TUTOR-SALIBA CORPORATION, ON 08/07/17

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2016
  • PARTY NICHELLE JOHNSON UPDATED: CORRECT NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NICHELLE JOHNSON FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 160412-0421 $435.00; 160412-0421-CK Reference Number 1915

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • VOLUME # 1 BEGINS ON THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • NEW VOLUME MADE. VOLUME 1 INCLUDES DOCUMENTS FILED BETWEEN 04/12/16 AND 05/19/17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.