This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/21/2021 at 13:29:37 (UTC).

JOHNSON -V- CPES CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 05/03/2018 JOHNSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CPES CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Poncin, Lynn. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2942

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Poncin, Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TERRENCE JOHNSON

JOHNSON, TERRENCE

Defendants

CPES CALIFORNIA, INC

CPES CALIFORNIA, INC AFS: TIKI THOMPSON

Not Yet Classified

CONV

 

Court Documents

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGME

08/08/2018: COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGME

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING LYNN PONCIN,JUDGE CLERK- SHOS

07/31/2018: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING LYNN PONCIN,JUDGE CLERK- SHOS

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CPES CALIFORN

06/27/2018: AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CPES CALIFORN

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CPES CALIFORN

06/27/2018: AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CPES CALIFORN

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING LYNN PONCIN,JUDGE CLERK- SHOS

06/27/2018: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING LYNN PONCIN,JUDGE CLERK- SHOS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED AS TO

06/25/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED AS TO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA BY TERRENCE JOHNSON O

06/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA BY TERRENCE JOHNSON O

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF -$5,000 -$10,000(IMAGED) 180503

05/03/2018: CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF -$5,000 -$10,000(IMAGED) 180503

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketAudio upload completed; Comment: AUDIO CD AND AUDIO UPLOAD COMPLETED ON 04/09/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20190405-0435; ConversionPayment; $22.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $22.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketAudio CD Requested; Comment: AUDIO CD AND AUDIO UPLOAD OF THE ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED PROCEEDINGS HELD ON 07/31/18, PURCHASED BY 22.00 190405-0435-DB FAR/ 22.00 PAYMT 190405-0435-DB REFERENCE NUMBER 031-0213240798

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed; Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 08/08/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed; Comment: COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Poncin, Lynn; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment; Comment; Comment: (5/3/2018 - 0001 - ICHClaim of Plaintiff (imaged)); Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: JOHNSON, TERRENCE; Awarded Against: CPES CALIFORNIA, INC AFS: TIKI THOMPSON; Amount; Damages: $0.00; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $75.00; Other: $8,000.00; Other Comment: Principal; Total: $8075.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Poncin, Lynn; Comment: RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER LYNN PONCIN,JUDGE CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL - COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER: JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) OF TERRENCE JOHNSON ORDERED ENTERED 08/03/18 JUDGMENT FOR: TERRENCE JOHNSON JUDGMENT AGAINST: CPES CALIFORNIA, INC JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $8,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $75.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $8075.00 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC) === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketRuling on Submitted Matter; Original Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Judicial Officer: Poncin, Lynn; Hearing Time: 04:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Poncin, Lynn; Comment: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING LYNN PONCIN,JUDGE CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL COURT ATTENDANT T MEJIA - APPEARANCES: PLAINTIFF TERRENCE JOHNSON PRESENT CPES CALIFORNIA, INC REPRESENTED BY TIKI THOMPSON & ADEGBOYEGA AGBELUSI. - PROCEEDINGS: PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD. SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 01:32 AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED. COURT INDICATES THAT PROPER JURISDICTION FOR THIS CASE IS BARSTOW. DEFENDANT AGREES THAT MATTER CAN BE HEARD IN THIS COURT. DEFENDANT WAIVES CASE BEING HEARD IN PROPER JURISDICTION. - COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS. WITNESS -- TERRENCE JOHNSON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. ANTHONY STALLWORTH IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF. DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW. TIKI THOMPSON IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT. ADEGBOYEGA AGBELUSI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT. DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW. RECESS TAKEN TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO ACCESS RECORDING TO BE PLAYED. 02:59 - 03:03 PLAINTIFF PLAYS AUDIO RECORDING IN OPEN COURT. WITNESS -- TERRENCE JOHNSON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. ADEGBOYEGA AGBELUSI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT. TIKI THOMPSON IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT. MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. 03:25 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA BY TERRENCE JOHNSON ON 06/22/18 AS TO CPES CALIFORNIA, INC, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20180503-0945; ConversionPayment; $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20180503-0942; ConversionPayment; $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $99.50; Total Payments and Credits: $99.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY TERRENCE JOHNSON FOR COPIES 180503-0945-DB FCP/ 2.50 PAYMT 180503-0945-DB REFERENCE NUMBER 031-0109586686

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketUpdate Default Department to:; Comment: UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed; Comment: CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED) 180503-0942-DB SMC/ 75.00 PAYMT 180503-0942-DB REFERENCE NUMBER 031-0109586686

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CPES CALIFORNIA INC is a litigant