This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/14/2018 at 09:27:57 (UTC).

JOHN J DWIERS -V- JASON ADDISON SMITH

Case Summary

On 01/24/2000 JOHN J DWIERS filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against JASON ADDISON SMITH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5306

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2000

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN JAY DWIERS

Defendant

JASON ADDISON SMITH CONSULTINGSERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LABOR COMMISSIONEROF CALIFORNIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/13/2010

DocketFILING FEE PAID BY JOHN JAY DWIERS FOR FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 100514-0459 $86.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2010

DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2000

DocketRETURN MAIL: NTCE OF ENTRY OF JDGMNT RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2000

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON FOREIGN JUDGMENT FILED 01/24/2000 OF JOHN DWIERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2000

DocketCHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM NALC TO CSJ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2000

DocketAPPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON FOREIGN JUDGMENT FILED 01/24/2000 OF JOHN DWIERS ORDERED ENTERED 01/24/00; JUDGMENT FOR: JOHN JAY DWIERS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JASON ADDISON SMITHCONSULTINGSERVICES INC; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1261.60 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $86.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,347.60; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.; CASE DISPOSITIONED BY JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less