This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 01:08:33 (UTC).

JOHN D LOPEZ RODRIGUEZ - DILMA O RIVAS ORELLANA

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 JOHN D LOPEZ RODRIGUEZ - DILMA O RIVAS ORELLANA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8346

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHN DENIS LOPEZ RODRIGUEZ

Respondent

DILMA O RIVAS ORELLANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FREDDIE VEGA

119 North 2Nd Avenue

Upland, CA 91786

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - OTHER DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (FL); DISPOSITION OTHER DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DILMA O RIVAS ORELLANA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF JOHN LOPEZ RODRIGUEZ AS TO DILMA O RIVAS ORELLANA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): RESPONDENT HAS NOT FILED A RESPONSE TO THE PETITIO N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • NOTICE OF LIMITED SCOPY BY ATTORNEY STACY ALBELAIS FILED BY DILMA O RIVAS ORELLANA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • ATTACHMENT TO 12/04/17 MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN DENIS LOPEZ RODRIGUEZ RE: CC/CV/RETURN OF SS & MEDICAL CARDS (092717); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TERESA S BENNETT, JUDGE; CLERK: ROSEMARY ROJAS; COURT REPORTER THERESA MADRIGAL 8510; BAILIFF: C BARAJAS; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER JOHN DENIS LOPEZ RODRIGUEZ PRESENT; ATTORNEY FREDDIE VEGA PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; RESPONDENT DILMA O RIVAS ORELLANA PRESENT; ATTORNEY STACY ABELAIS PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER CYNTHIA CAMPOS # 300532 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR JOHN D LOPEZ RODRIGUEZ. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER ESTELA SANCHEZ # 301051 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR DILMA O RIVAS ORELLANA. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; WITNESS -- JOHN DENIS LOPEZ RODRIGUEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- DILMA O RIVAS ORELLANA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WRITTEN REPORT RECEIVED FROM CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELOR MICHELLE SALGUERO.; REPORT OF CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELOR IS READ AND CONSIDERED BY THE COURT.; COPIES GIVEN TO PARTIES/COUNSEL.; FAMILY COURT SERVICES REPORT FILED.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY BOTH COUNSEL .; THE COURT FINDS IT HAS JURISDICTION TO MAKE ORDERS REGARDING CHILD CUSTODY UNDER THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT.; CUSTODY AND VISITATION ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:; PURSUANT TO FAMILY CODE SECTION 3048, THE COURT HAS JURISDICTION TO MAKE ORDERS REGARDING CUSTODY UNDER THE FAMILY CODE AND THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT.; NOTICE AND OPPORTUNITY TO BE HEARD WAS GIVEN TO THE PARTIES/RESPONDING PARTY AS PROVIDED BY THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.; THE COUNTRY OF HABITUAL RESIDENCE OF THE CHILD/CHILDREN IS THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.; COURT MAKES ORDERS PURSUANT TO CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING REPORT AS ATTACHED AND ORDERED INCORPORATED INTO THE MINUTE ORDER.; PURSUANT TO ATTACHED RECOMMENDATION; COPY OF WHICH IS AMENDED BY COURT; THE COURT MAKES ADDITIONAL ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: MOTHER SHALL HAVE VISITATION WITH MINOR CHILDREN; ON 12/22/17 TO 12/25/17 AT NOON AND 12/29/17 TO 01/01/18 AT NOON.; PETITIONERS COUNSEL TO PREPARE FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING REPORT FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT: S46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; ************** SECOND NOTICE *************** YOUR DOCUMENTS ARE BEING RETURNED FOR THE; FOLLOWING REASONS: THE FORMS YOU HAVE SUBMITTED ARE COPIES AND THE COURT REQUIRES THE ORIGINALS;; YOUR FORMS ARE INCOMPLETE (SEE RED MARKED AREAS); ON YOUR PROOF OF SERVICE, PLEASE LIST THE; DOCUMENTS THAT WERE SERVED BY FORM NAME - NOT NUMBER; YOU MUST HAVE YOUR RESPONSES BE IN; ENGLISH, NOT SPANISH. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT OR SEEK LEGAL ASSISTANCE TO HELP YOU.; THANK YOU.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JOHN DENIS LOPEZ RODRIGUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • JOHN DENIS LOPEZ RODRIGUEZ IS DIRECTED TO REPORT TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FORTHWITH FOR ORIENTATION AND CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING APPOINTMENTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REFERRAL TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JOHN DENIS LOPEZ RODRIGUEZ RE: CC/CV/RETURN OF SS & MEDICAL CARDS (092717).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less