This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/16/2019 at 16:15:18 (UTC).

JOHN BRAUGHTON -V- ROBERT SMITH

Case Summary

On 09/03/2010 JOHN BRAUGHTON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROBERT SMITH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9733

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN BRAUGHTON

Defendant

ROBERT SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BONNEVILLE, CURTISS D

112 N Second Avenue

Covina, CA 91723

 

Court Documents

FINAL RETURN TO COURT WRIT OF EXECUTION FILED.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT WRIT OF EXECUTION FILED.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT WRIT OF EXECUTION FILED.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT WRIT OF EXECUTION FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 120424-1858 $40.00; 120424-1858-CK Reference Number 18857

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $145.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $13,440.60

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $145.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $13,440.60

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,650.88

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,650.88

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/03/2010 OF JOHN BRAUGHTON FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/03/2010 OF JOHN BRAUGHTON FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/03/2010 OF JOHN BRAUGHTON ORDERED ENTERED 02/17/11; JUDGMENT FOR: JOHN BRAUGHTON; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROBERT SMITH; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $200,000.00 INTEREST $10,083.20 ATTORNEY FEES $4,700.00 COSTS $395.20 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $215,178.40; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST FILED BY JOHN BRAUGHTON

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST FILED BY JOHN BRAUGHTON

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/03/2010 OF JOHN BRAUGHTON AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/03/2010 OF JOHN BRAUGHTON AS TO DOES ONLY

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOHN BRAUGHTON.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOHN BRAUGHTON.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROBERT SMITH FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROBERT SMITH FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C FILED AS TO ROBERT SMITH. PARTY SERVED ON 11/28/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $69.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C FILED AS TO ROBERT SMITH. PARTY SERVED ON 11/28/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $69.50.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100909-4772 $355.00

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/03/2010 OF JOHN BRAUGHTON - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/03/2010 OF JOHN BRAUGHTON - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT WRIT OF EXECUTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: MARY ELLEN MURAWA; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN BRAUGHTON; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCE AND NO PROOF OF SERVICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 120424-1858 $40.00; 120424-1858-CK Reference Number 18857

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 228789.00 ); Minutes; Receipt: 111013-0489 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $145.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $13,440.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY JOHN BRAUGHTON; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT ISSUED TO PLA SASE 032211 ); Minutes; Receipt: 110322-2544 $25.00; 110322-2544-CK Reference Number 18495

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,650.88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 110311-0867 $25.00; 110311-0867-CK Reference Number 18493

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROBERT SMITH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/03/2010 OF JOHN BRAUGHTON AS TO ROBERT SMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/03/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C FILED AS TO ROBERT SMITH. PARTY SERVED ON 11/28/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $69.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100909-4772 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/03/2010 OF JOHN BRAUGHTON - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.