This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 04:33:12 (UTC).

JINKS-V-SELENE FINANCE, L.P. ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 JINKS-V-SELENE FINANCE, L P was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1176

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCUS JINKS

Defendants

AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC

CASTLE PEAK 2012-1LOAN TRUST

CPCA TRUST 1

U.S.BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR CASTLE PEAK

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS,

SELENE FINANCE, L.P.

COBRA-28 NO 7, LP

PACIFIC MERCANTILEBANK

U.S. BANK TRUS T NATIONAL ASSOCAITION IN IT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARA, TONY

2973 Harbor Blvd Suite 594

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorneys

WRIGHT, FINLAY & ZAK

4665 Macarthur Court Suite 280

Newport Beach, CA 92660

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 West Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON MAY 25, 2017 HEARING FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON MAY 25, 2017 HEARING FILED.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/25/17 FILED BY COBRA-28 NO 7, LP. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/25/17 FILED BY COBRA-28 NO 7, LP. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 05/25/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARCUS JINKS (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 05/25/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARCUS JINKS (IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY SELENE FINANCE, L.P., U.S.BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR CASTLE PEAK, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,, U.S. BANK TRUS T NATIONAL ASSOCAITION IN IT; REPRESENTED BY WRIGHT, FINLAY & ZAK(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY SELENE FINANCE, L.P., U.S.BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR CASTLE PEAK, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,, U.S. BANK TRUS T NATIONAL ASSOCAITION IN IT; REPRESENTED BY WRIGHT, FINLAY & ZAK(IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PACIFIC MERCANTILEBANK; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/27/17 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PACIFIC MERCANTILEBANK; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/27/17 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/01/17 FILED BY SELENE FINANCE, L.P., CPCA TRUST 1, CASTLE PEAK 2012-1LOAN TRUST, U.S.BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR CASTLE PEAK, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/01/17 FILED BY SELENE FINANCE, L.P., CPCA TRUST 1, CASTLE PEAK 2012-1LOAN TRUST, U.S.BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR CASTLE PEAK, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,. (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF ERRATA CORRECTING NAME OF REPRESENTED DEFENDANT FILED BY SELENE FINANCE, L.P., CPCA TRUST 1, CASTLE PEAK 2012-1LOAN TRUST, U.S.BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR CASTLE PEAK, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,.

NOTICE OF ERRATA CORRECTING NAME OF REPRESENTED DEFENDANT FILED BY SELENE FINANCE, L.P., CPCA TRUST 1, CASTLE PEAK 2012-1LOAN TRUST, U.S.BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR CASTLE PEAK, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CASTLE PEAK 2012-1LOAN TRUST; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/21/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CASTLE PEAK 2012-1LOAN TRUST; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/21/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

DEMURRER FILED BY SELENE FINANCE, L.P., CPCA TRUST 1, U.S.BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR CASTLE PEAK, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,; REPRESENTED BY WRIGHT, FINLAY & ZAK(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY SELENE FINANCE, L.P., CPCA TRUST 1, U.S.BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR CASTLE PEAK, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,; REPRESENTED BY WRIGHT, FINLAY & ZAK(IMAGED)

NOTICE OF REJECTED DEMURRER SENT.

NOTICE OF REJECTED DEMURRER SENT.; Minutes; ON THE DEMURRER THE DEFENDANT CPCA TRUST 1 NEEDS TO ANSWER AS SUED FOR STATE; ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS. SEE COPY OF COMPLAINT.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL(FTA/FTP)/TSC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: PATRICIA VEGA; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; 08:37; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: FAILURE TO APPEAR/PROSECUTE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CANNONT DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION AS A JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; (CLERKS CALENDAR); CLERK: PATRICIA VEGA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; 08:45; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, THE COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR:; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL(FTA/FTP)/TSC SET FOR 11/14/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF 08/08/17 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MARCUS JINKS FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MARCUS JINKS ORDERED ENTERED 06/29/17; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT SELENE FINANCE, L.P., U.S.BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR CASTLE PEAK, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,, U.S. BANK TRUS T NATIONAL ASSOCAITION IN IT; AND AGAINST MARCUS JINKS; IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL RECOVER NOTHING BY WAY OF HIS; OPERATIVE COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANTS LISTED ABOVE AND THAT AS PREVAILING PARTIES THESE SAME; DEFENDANTS ARE ENTITLED TO ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS BY WAY OF APPLICATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; (CLERKS CALENDAR); CLERK: PATRICIA VEGA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PROPOSED JUDGMENT WAS SUBMITTED TO THE COURT ON 6/13/17.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/08/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON MAY 25, 2017 HEARING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO PLAITNIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SELENE FINANCE, L.P., U.S.BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR CASTLE PEAK, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,, U.S. BANK TRUS T NATIONAL ASSOCAITION IN IT; Disposition: Sustained; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY URSULA G BARRIOS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MARCUS JINKS.; ATTORNEY JEAN C SPAEDER-YOUNKIN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SELENE FINANCE, L.P., U.S.BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR CASTLE PEAK, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY CHERYL HOUDE FOR H. G. LONG & ASSOC. FOR COBRA-28 NO 7, LP.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; SELENE FINANCE, L.P., U.S.BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR CASTLE PEAK, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,'S MOTION RE DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS HEARD.; COURT ISSUES ITS TENTATIVE RULING.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT ADOPTS ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS THE COURTS ORDER.; COURT FINDS:; DEMURRER IS SUSTAINED AS TO FIRST AND SECOND CAUSES OF ACTION ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MARCUS JINKS , WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY ATTORNEY SPAEDER-YOUNKIN.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • MOTION RE: DEMURRER (042717) FILED BY DEFENDANT COBRA-28 NO 7, LP; Disposition: Sustained; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY URSULA G BARRIOS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MARCUS JINKS.; ATTORNEY JEAN C SPAEDER-YOUNKIN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SELENE FINANCE, L.P., U.S.BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR CASTLE PEAK, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS,.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY CHERYL HOUDE FOR H. G. LONG & ASSOC. FOR COBRA-28 NO 7, LP.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; COBRA-28 NO 7, LP'S MOTION RE DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS HEARD.; COURT ISSUES ITS TENTATIVE RULING.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT ADOPTS ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS THE COURTS ORDER.; COURT FINDS:; DEMURRER IS SUSTAINED AS TO FIRST AND SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MARCUS JINKS , WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY MOVING PARTY.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REJECTED DEMURRER SENT.; Minutes; ON THE DEMURRER THE DEFENDANT CPCA TRUST 1 NEEDS TO ANSWER AS SUED FOR STATE; ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS. SEE COPY OF COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MARCUS JINKS, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS, IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PARTY U.S.BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR CASTLE PEAK UPDATED: CORRECTED NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MARCUS JINKS, U.S.BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR CASTLE PEAK IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0517 $435.00; 161214-0517-CK Reference Number #106122

    Read MoreRead Less