This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 06:26:17 (UTC).

JIANGSU WORLD -V- ERGOCRAFT

Case Summary

On 08/19/2010 JIANGSU WORLD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ERGOCRAFT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9124

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JIANGSU WORLD PLANT-PROTECTINGMACHINERY CO

TING WANG

JIANGSU WORLD ELECTROMECHANICAL CO LTD

WEIYAO WANG

JIANGSU WORLD MACHINERY & ELECTRONICS GROUP

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ERGOCRAFT, INC

AMERICAN METAL FURNITURE, INC

KUAN-MENG LIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

COGSWELL NAKAZAWA & CHANG LLP

444 W. Ocean Blvd Ste 1410

Long Beach, CA 90802

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SAMX J WU, APC

8600 Utica Ave. Building 100

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2017
  • $316.00 REPORTER FEES REIMBURSED TO THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 023-0263994789

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JIANGSU WORLD PLANT-PROTECTINGMACHINERY CO FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160719-0085 $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORAP IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ALREADY FILED ON 07/07/16 - SUBMITTED TWICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: SULMA TORRES; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT V AMADOR; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PEIWEN CHANG PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT KUAN-MENG LIN PRESENT; INTERPRETER BO HUANG FOR DEFENDANT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR.; WITNESS -- DEFENDANT KUAN-MENG LIN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; 08:34; COUNSEL, DEFENDANT AND INTERPRETER PROCEED TO CONFER OFF THE RECORD.; 09:34; COUNSEL REPRESENTS ALL DOCUMENTATION AND INFORMATION FROM DEFENDANT WAS RECEIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KUAN-MENG LIN FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160715-0685 $2.00; 160715-0685-VS Reference Number 023-0263754891

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • ORAP RETURNED SERVED AS TO KUAN-MENG LIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • ** VOID ** FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • REPORTER'S FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $316.00 PAID BY PLAINTIFF.; Minutes; Receipt: 160707-0356 $316.00; 160707-0356-VS Reference Number 0230262887885

    Read MoreRead Less
210 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2010
  • MOTION RE: (11/23/10) TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ERGOCRAFT, INC, KUAN-MENG LIN; Minutes; Receipt: 101123-2740 $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO KUAN-MENG LIN SERVED ON 09/29/10 WITH FEES OF $73.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ERGOCRAFT, INC SERVED ON 09/29/10 WITH FEES OF $73.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/19/2010 OF JIANGSU WORLD PLANT-PROTECTINGMACHINERY CO - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100819-0688 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R9

    Read MoreRead Less