This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 08:53:42 (UTC).

JIANG -V- JACOB/LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 01/04/2017 JIANG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JACOB/LOPEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0002

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

XUE QING JENNY JIANG

Defendants

JESUS LOPEZ

STEVE JACOB

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED BY XUE QING JENNY JIANG. (GOVERNMENTAL) (IMAGED)

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED BY XUE QING JENNY JIANG. (GOVERNMENTAL) (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 BY PERSONAL ON 03/04/17 AS TO STEVE JACOB, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 BY PERSONAL ON 03/04/17 AS TO STEVE JACOB, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 BY PERSONAL ON 03/04/17 AS TO JESUS LOPEZ, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 BY PERSONAL ON 03/04/17 AS TO JESUS LOPEZ, FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO STEVE JACOB, WITH PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO STEVE JACOB, WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170104-0381 $50.00; 170104-0381-CK Reference Number 352

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170104-0381 $50.00; 170104-0381-CK Reference Number 352

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2017
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; JOEL AGRON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; COURT REPORTER ROWENA MASIH 7426; BAILIFF: S LEACH; MINUTES UPDATED BY NADINE GOLDEN; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: XUE QING JENNY JIANG, STEVE JACOB, JESUS LOPEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NO APPEARANCE BY MOVING PARTY.; CLAIM OF EXEMPTION DENIED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; JOEL AGRON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: ROBIN RYAN; COURT REPORTER ROWENA MASIH 7426; BAILIFF: S LEACH; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF XUE QING JENNY JIANG PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; WITNESS -- XUE QUING JENNY JIANG IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; NO SERVICE OF ORAP.; COURT WAIVES FILING FEE FOR FUTURE ORAP FILING.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO SERVICE; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170511-0896 $60.00; 170511-0896-VS Reference Number 026-0039460962

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED BY XUE QING JENNY JIANG. (GOVERNMENTAL) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • VACATE ORAP HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/17/17 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT M4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170406-0535 $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 03/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 BY PERSONAL ON 03/04/17 AS TO STEVE JACOB, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 BY PERSONAL ON 03/04/17 AS TO JESUS LOPEZ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO STEVE JACOB, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; JOEL AGRON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; COURT REPORTER ROWENA MASIH 7426; BAILIFF: S LEACH; PLAINTIFF XUE QING JENNY JIANG PRESENT; DEFENDANT STEVE JACOB PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JESUS LOPEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; PROOF OF SERVICE FILED IN COURT; PROOF OF SERVICE FILED IN COURT; XUE QUING JENNY JIANG IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; STEVE JACOB IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT GRANTS PETITIONERS REQUEST TO DISMISS; AS TO STEVE JACOB ONLY.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 01/04/2017 OF XUE JIANG ORDERED ENTERED 03/20/17; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT XUE QING JENNY JIANG HAVE &; RECOVER FROM JESUS LOPEZ:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $150.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,650.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170104-0390 $7.00; 170104-0390-VS Reference Number 0310004497944

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170104-0381 $50.00; 170104-0381-CK Reference Number 352

    Read MoreRead Less