This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 01:10:18 (UTC).

JESUS M. PUGA -N- JENNIFER T. RETANA

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 JESUS M PUGA -N- JENNIFER T RETANA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8359

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JESUS M PUGA

Respondent

JENNIFER T RETANA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2018
  • VACATE SDEF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/29/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • NEJ MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 07/06/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF JESUS PUGA FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF JESUS PUGA ORDERED ENTERED 02/28/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JENNIFER T RETANA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF JESUS PUGA AS TO JENNIFER T RETANA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON JENNIFER T RETANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JESUS M PUGA RE: OTHER: DOCUMENTS TO BE REINSTATED (010518); Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; ARTHUR A HARRISON, JUDGE; CLERK: CHERI CLARK; COURT REPORTER TERESA HIGH 11048; BAILIFF: M LOZANO; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER JESUS M PUGA PRESENT; RESPONDENT JENNIFER T RETANA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; WITNESS -- BOTH PARTIES ARE/ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JESUS M PUGA'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE: DOCUMENTS TO BE REINSTATED IS GRANTED; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT JENNIFER T RETANA.; ****STATUS TAKEN****; THE COURT FINDS THAT THE STATUTORY AND JURISDICTIONAL RESIDENT REQUIREMENTS ARE MET.; THE COURT FINDS JURISDICTION WAS ACQUIRED BY JENNIFER T RETANA ON 01/05/18; BY FILING OF SERVICE OF PROCESS.; DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE GRANTED ON GROUNDS OF IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES; MARITAL STATUS TERMINATE 07/06/18, OR UPON SIGNING OF JUDGMENT, WHICHEVER LATER OCCURS.; NOTICE - CAUTION: YOU ARE NOT OFFICIALLY DIVORCED UNTIL JUDGMENT IS SIGNED BY A JUDICIAL OFFICER INDICATING THE OFFICIAL DATE OF THE TERMINATION OF MARRIAGE.; THE COURT RESERVES JURISDICTION ON THE FOLLOWING ISSUES: ANY UNRESOLVED MATTERS.; JESUS M PUGA TO PREPARE JUDGMENT.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF JESUS M PUGA IS DEN.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • VACATE SPOS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/27/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JENNIFER T RETANA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/27/17 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JESUS M PUGA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less