Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 12:51:40 (UTC).

JEREMY ZUY DOANNE -N- JOLIKIM WINSCHI DOANNE

Case Summary

On 08/07/2017 JEREMY ZUY DOANNE -N- JOLIKIM WINSCHI DOANNE was filed as a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2435

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JEREMY ZUY DOANNE

Respondent

JOLIKIM WINSCHI DOANNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON LEGAL SEPARATION NO CHILDREN FILED 08/07/2017 OF JEREMY DOANNE FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON LEGAL SEPARATION NO CHILDREN FILED 08/07/2017 OF JEREMY DOANNE ORDERED ENTERED 09/21/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON LEGAL SEPARATION NO CHILDREN FILED 08/07/2017 OF JEREMY DOANNE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 09/20/17 BY JEREMY ZUY DOANNE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JEREMY ZUY DOANNE FOR FNL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOLIKIM WINSCHI DOANNE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON LEGAL SEPARATION NO CHILDREN FILED 08/07/2017 OF JEREMY DOANNE AS TO JOLIKIM WINSCHI DOANNE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS,PETITION,DECL OF DISCL,PROP DECL,I&E FILED AS TO JOLIKIM WINSCHI DOANNE. PARTY SERVED ON 08/12/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NAR. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JEREMY ZUY DOANNE FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS,PETITION,DECL OF DISCL,PROP DECL,I&E BY JOLIKIM WINSCHI DOANNE WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 08/12/17 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM DMN TO LSN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • UPDATE COMPLAINT OF LEGAL SEPARATION NO CHILDREN FILED 08/07/2017 OF JEREMY DOANNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JEREMY ZUY DOANNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF JEREMY ZUY DOANNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170807-0765 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V11

    Read MoreRead Less