This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 05:55:55 (UTC).

JENNIFER PATTON -V- DENNY'S INC

Case Summary

On 12/21/2016 JENNIFER PATTON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DENNY'S INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1654

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNIFER PATTON

Defendants

RAMON DOE

DENNY'S CORPORATION

DIANNE HAMILTON

SONIA M PUENTE

ADRIANA CONCEPTION SANCHEZ

DENNY'S INC

DIANNE ELISA JONES

ADRIANA CONCEPCION SANCHEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANNEMANN LAW FIRM, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORAT

1042 N. Mountain Ave Suite B-222

Upland, CA 91786

Defendant Attorney

SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

379 Lytton Ave

Palo Alto, CA 94301

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BY US MAIL ON 07/31/17 AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BY US MAIL ON 07/31/17 AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES, FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.; Minutes; VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/29/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/28/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S30

PROOF OF SERVICE OF STIP TO CONTINUE TSC BY MAIL ON 06/21/17 AS TO HANNEMANN LAW FIRM & MILON PLUAS LLP, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF STIP TO CONTINUE TSC BY MAIL ON 06/21/17 AS TO HANNEMANN LAW FIRM & MILON PLUAS LLP, FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ANSWER FILED BY ADRIANA CONCEPCION SANCHEZ, DIANNE ELISA JONES; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY ADRIANA CONCEPCION SANCHEZ, DIANNE ELISA JONES; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS DENNYS INC & DENNYS CORP BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 01/27/17 AS TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS DENNYS INC & DENNYS CORP BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 01/27/17 AS TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS DENNYS INC & DENNYS CORP BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 01/27/17 AS TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS DENNYS INC & DENNYS CORP BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 01/27/17 AS TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY DENNY'S INC, DENNY'S CORPORATION; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY DENNY'S INC, DENNY'S CORPORATION; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ADRIANA CONCEPCION SANCHEZ SERVED ON 01/04/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ADRIANA CONCEPCION SANCHEZ SERVED ON 01/04/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DENNY'S CORPORATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/28/16 WITH COSTS OF $53.95 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DENNY'S CORPORATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/28/16 WITH COSTS OF $53.95 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161221-0063 $435.00; 161221-0063-CK Reference Number 3500515

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BY US MAIL ON 07/31/17 AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.; Minutes; VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/29/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/28/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF STIP TO CONTINUE TSC BY MAIL ON 06/21/17 AS TO HANNEMANN LAW FIRM & MILON PLUAS LLP, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JENNIFER PATTON FOR STIP TO CONITNUE TSC; Minutes; Receipt: 170622-0258 $20.00; 170622-0258-CK Reference Number CK#D3560106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): AN ORDER IS REQUIRED FOR INCORRECT NAME ON FORM SB-16778.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JENNIFER PATTON FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170609-0344 $2.00; 170609-0344-VS Reference Number 033-0021137828

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2017
  • PARTY ADRIANA CONCEPCION SANCHEZ UPDATED: NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ADRIANA CONCEPCION SANCHEZ SERVED ON 01/04/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DENNY'S CORPORATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/28/16 WITH COSTS OF $53.95 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DENNY'S INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/28/16 WITH COSTS OF $95.95 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161221-0063 $435.00; 161221-0063-CK Reference Number 3500515

    Read MoreRead Less