This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 23:44:36 (UTC).

JENNIFER M GOODMAN -N- JASON R GOODMAN

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 JENNIFER M GOODMAN -N- JASON R GOODMAN was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8011

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JENNIFER M GOODMAN

Respondent

JASON R GOODMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2017
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/15/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 03/27/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JENNIFER M GOODMAN RE: CC/CV/CS (091417); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • JUDGMENT SIGNED TRACKED TO PROCESSING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • VACATE RFOF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/15/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S51.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • JUDGMENT SENT TO DEPT S51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 09/14/2017 OF JENNIFER GOODMAN FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 09/14/2017 OF JENNIFER GOODMAN ORDERED ENTERED 11/09/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF JASON R GOODMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON JASON R GOODMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • FAMILY COURT SERVICES: APPT ON 10-24-17 @ 8 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JENNIFER M GOODMAN RE: CC/CV/CS (091417).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JENNIFER M GOODMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF JENNIFER M GOODMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY JENNIFER M GOODMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0128 $525.00; 170914-0128-EZ Reference Number 9ME04489UP63657

    Read MoreRead Less