This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 01:58:57 (UTC).

JENNIE SPERE VS CHRISTOPHER OBERG

Case Summary

On 09/30/2010 JENNIE SPERE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER OBERG. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0664

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARIA CATALINA RAMOS

WILLIAM FINCH

JENNIE SPERE

THE LEMM FAMILY TRUST

MARY LEMM

Defendants

GERARD NORRIS & ASSOCIATES

RANDY DEL RIO

CHRISTOPHER N OBERG

ANTHONY CHAVEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GLENN PARK

8556 Nuevo Avenue

Fontana, CA 92335

LAW OFFICES OF RICK GAXIOLA

8556 Nuevo Avenue

Fontana, CA 92335

Defendant Attorney

BATTRAM, LINDA M

140 West Foothill Blvd Suite B

Claremont, CA 91711

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2013
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL/STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: MARY ELLEN MURAWA; COURT REPORTER HEATHER PFUTZENREUTER 10294; COURT ATTENDANT R ARAGON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GLENN PARK PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY LINDA BATTRAM PRESENT FOR DEFENDANTS CHRISTOPHER OBERG, GERARD NORRIS.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANTHONY CHAVEZ; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: WILLIAM FINCH; LAW OFFICES OF RICKGAXIOLA FOR WILLIAM FINCH NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: PLAINTIFFS MOTION.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE:SANCTION LINDA BATTRAM/FAIL TO NTC; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: MARY ELLEN MURAWA; COURT REPORTER HEATHER PFUTZENREUTER 10294; COURT ATTENDANT R ARAGON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GLENN PARK PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY LINDA M. BATTRAM PRESENT FOR DEFENDANTS CHRISTOPHER OBERG, GERARD NORRIS.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANTHONY CHAVEZ; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: WILLIAM FINCH; LAW OFFICES OF RICKGAXIOLA FOR WILLIAM FINCH NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT INQUIRES OF COUNSEL.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE:SANCTION FTA GLENN PARK 120412; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: MARY ELLEN MURAWA; COURT REPORTER HEATHER PFUTZENREUTER 10294; COURT ATTENDANT R ARAGON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GLENN PARK PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY LINDA BATTRAM PRESENT FOR DEFENDANTS CHRISTOPHER OBERG, GERARD NORRIS.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANTHONY CHAVEZ; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: WILLIAM FINCH; LAW OFFICES OF RICKGAXIOLA FOR WILLIAM FINCH NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT INQUIRES OF COUNSEL.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • RESPONSE TO OSC; DECL OF GLENN PARK RE SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • PARTY ANTHONY CHAVEZ UPDATED: ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL/STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER CYNTHIA GARCIA 12152; COURT ATTENDANT R ARAGON; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT TAKES NOTE THAT NO NOTICE OF TODAYS HEARING HAS BEEN FILED. COURT ORDERED ATTORNEY; LINDA BATTRAM TO GIVE NOTICE OF TODAYS HEARING AT THE HEARING ON DECEMBER 4, 2012.; COURT CONTINUES THIS HEARING AND SETS AN OSC RE:SANCTION HEARING AGAINST DEFENSE COUNSEL; LINDA BATTRAM FOR HER FAILURE TO PROVIDE PROPER NOTICE OF TODAYS HEARING.; LINDA BATTRAM IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND/OR FAILURE TO FILE REQUIRED DOCUMENTS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/30/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9.; HEARING RE: OSC RE:SANCTION LINDA BATTRAM/FAIL TO NTC SET FOR 09/30/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER WITH NEW HEARING DATE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE:SANCTION FTA GLENN PARK 120412; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER CYNTHIA GARCIA 12152; COURT ATTENDANT R ARAGON; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ON THE COURTS MOTION THIS HEARING HAS BEEN CONTINUED AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/30/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER WITH NEW HEARING DATE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2011
  • CMS SEN TO CAL PREP BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CHRISTOPHER N OBERG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • NO COPY OF DEMURRER PROVIDED FOR CONFORMING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DEMURRER FILED BY CHRISTOPHER N OBERG, ANTHONY CHAVEZ, RANDY DEL RIO, GERARD NORRIS & ASSOCIATES; REPRESENTED BY LINDA M BATTRAM; Minutes; Receipt: 110107-2400 $1,590.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MICHAEL S MINK, JUDGE; CLERK: LESLIE RICHARDSON; COURT REPORTER NANCY HERALDEZ 8191; COURT ATTENDANT R UNGER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RICK GAXIOLA PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL TO HAVE PROOFS OF SERVICE FILED.; ANSWERS DUE ON 1/7/10.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/25/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/30/2010 OF JENNIE SPERE - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 101006-3769 $382.16

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.