This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:36:38 (UTC).

JEFFERSON-V-ILUOBE

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 JEFFERSON-V-ILUOBE was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1551

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

Defendant

CLARICE ILUOBE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAR, ANGIE HONG

P.O. Box 17210

Golden, CO 80402

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR ANGIE HONG HOAR FOR JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:56; SPECIALLY APPEARAING COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THAT CLIENT IS UNABLE TO LOCATE DEFENDANT AND; REQUEST MATTER BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; COURT GRANTS COUNSEL REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: REQUESTED BY COUNSEL.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:57; ACTION - COMPLETE

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO CLARICE ILUOBE WITH COSTS OF $67.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO CLARICE ILUOBE WITH COSTS OF $67.50

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR ANGIE HONG HOAR FOR JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:56; SPECIALLY APPEARAING COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THAT CLIENT IS UNABLE TO LOCATE DEFENDANT AND; REQUEST MATTER BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; COURT GRANTS COUNSEL REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: REQUESTED BY COUNSEL.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:57; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO CLARICE ILUOBE WITH COSTS OF $67.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0134 $196.00; 171031-0134-CK Reference Number 00101656

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $692.44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less