This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:48:12 (UTC).

JEFFERSON-V-GULA

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 JEFFERSON-V-GULA was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7934

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

Defendant

KATHY GULA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAR, ANGIE HONG

P.O. Box 17210

Golden, CO 80402

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

DECLARATION RE: CCP 585 DEC FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

DECLARATION RE: CCP 585 DEC FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 01/09/18; JUDGMENT FOR: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KATHY GULA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $612.40 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $263.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $875.90; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KATHY GULA FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KATHY GULA FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KATHY GULA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $67.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KATHY GULA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $67.50 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 585 DEC FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 01/09/18; JUDGMENT FOR: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KATHY GULA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $612.40 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $263.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $875.90; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KATHY GULA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC AS TO KATHY GULA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KATHY GULA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $67.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $612.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0211 $196.00; 170918-0211-CK Reference Number 000097682

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less