This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:48:23 (UTC).

JEFFERSON-V-BELL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 JEFFERSON-V-BELL was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7936

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

Defendant

CYNTHIA BELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAR, ANGIE HONG

P.O. Box 17210

Golden, CO 80402

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 01/09/18; JUDGMENT FOR: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CYNTHIA BELL; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $861.30 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $263.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,124.80; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

DECLARATION OF CCP585 FILED

DECLARATION OF CCP585 FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CYNTHIA BELL; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/05/17 WITH COSTS OF $67.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CYNTHIA BELL; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/05/17 WITH COSTS OF $67.50 FILED.

DECLARATION RE: CCP1033 FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

DECLARATION RE: CCP1033 FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CYNTHIA BELL FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CYNTHIA BELL FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC AS TO CYNTHIA BELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF CCP585 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP1033 FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 01/09/18; JUDGMENT FOR: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CYNTHIA BELL; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $861.30 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $263.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,124.80; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CYNTHIA BELL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CYNTHIA BELL; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/05/17 WITH COSTS OF $67.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $861.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0774 $196.00; 170918-0774-CK Reference Number 000097681

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less