This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:27:46 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL-V-SMITH

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 JEFFERSON CAPITAL-V-SMITH was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7878

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

Defendant

YANNICK SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAR, ANGIE HONG

P.O. Box 17210

Golden, CO 80402

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC WITH COSTS OF $67.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC WITH COSTS OF $67.50

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/14/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC WITH COSTS OF $67.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $537.22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 09/14/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0254 $196.00; 170915-0254-CK Reference Number 000095893

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less