This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 12:35:12 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL -V- MORENO

Case Summary

On 10/26/2017 JEFFERSON CAPITAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MORENO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1146

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

Defendant

LAURA MORENO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HONG HOAR, ANGIE

P.O. Box 17210

Golden, CO 80402

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/26/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/26/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/26/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 02/15/18; JUDGMENT FOR: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LAURA MORENO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $895.67 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $263.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,159.17; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON LAURA MORENO.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON LAURA MORENO.

DECLARATION OF EMILY IBURG ISO ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED

DECLARATION OF EMILY IBURG ISO ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 & WAIVER ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 & WAIVER ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LAURA MORENO SERVED ON 11/20/17 WITH FEES OF $67.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LAURA MORENO SERVED ON 11/20/17 WITH FEES OF $67.50.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0003 $196.00; 171030-0003-CK Reference Number 000101682

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( 1212.43 ); Minutes; Receipt: 180524-0618 $25.00; 180524-0618-CK Reference Number 000121676

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $28.26)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • WRIT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): #1 HAS TO INDICATE A COUNTY IN THE STATE OF CA NOT ABCLEGAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ON LINE 1 ABCLEGAL IS NOT A COUNTY, PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $10.48)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/26/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/26/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 02/15/18; JUDGMENT FOR: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LAURA MORENO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $895.67 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $263.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,159.17; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LAURA MORENO SERVED ON 11/20/17 WITH FEES OF $67.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • PLAINTIFF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $895.67

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0003 $196.00; 171030-0003-CK Reference Number 000101682

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.