This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:41:23 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL-V-JIMENEZ

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 JEFFERSON CAPITAL-V-JIMENEZ was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8179

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

Defendant

CYNTHIA I JIMENEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAR, ANGIE HONG

P.O. Box 17210

Golden, CO 80402

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 04/16/18; JUDGMENT FOR: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CYNTHIA I JIMENEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,753.95 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $263.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,017.45; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033/WAIVER OF ATTY FEES FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033/WAIVER OF ATTY FEES FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CYNTHIA I JIMENEZ.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CYNTHIA I JIMENEZ.

DECLARATION OF EMILY IBURG IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

DECLARATION OF EMILY IBURG IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CYNTHIA I JIMENEZ SERVED ON 10/30/17 WITH FEES OF $67.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CYNTHIA I JIMENEZ SERVED ON 10/30/17 WITH FEES OF $67.50.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 04/16/18; JUDGMENT FOR: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CYNTHIA I JIMENEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,753.95 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $263.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,017.45; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033/WAIVER OF ATTY FEES FILED BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CYNTHIA I JIMENEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC AS TO CYNTHIA I JIMENEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF EMILY IBURG IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CYNTHIA I JIMENEZ SERVED ON 10/30/17 WITH FEES OF $67.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,753.95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-1042 $196.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less