This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 17:22:00 (UTC).

JEANNIE BRIONES

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 JEANNIE BRIONES was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0410

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

KRISTY BRIONES

VALERIE BRIONES

Decedent

JEANNIE BRIONES

Other

ADVANCE INHERITANCE LLC

Not Classified By Court

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GAUDY LAW, INC

267 D Street

Upland, CA 91786

Other Attorney

LEESTMA, JAMES L

7301 Topanga Canyon Blvd, Ste 202

Conoga Park, CA 91307

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY VALERIE BRIONES, KRISTY BRIONES

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY VALERIE BRIONES, KRISTY BRIONES

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AIAE FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AIAE FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: BY VALERIE BRIONES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: BY MICHELLE BRIONES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: BY VALERIE BRIONES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: BY KRISTY BRIONES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • ORDER APPROVING FIRST AND FINAL REPORT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • FIRST AND FINAL WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF VALERIE BRIONES, KRISTY BRIONES AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY STEVEN URENDA PRESENT FOR PETITIONERS.; FIRST AND FINAL WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF VALERIE BRIONES, KRISTY BRIONES AND PETITION FOR; ALLOWANCE OF FEES IS GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 09/09/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • HRG OF 08/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPROVING FIRST AND FINAL REPORT OF ADM RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MUST SUBMIT ORIGINAL LETTERS TO THE COURT. "BY FAX" IS INSUFFICIENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY VALERIE BRIONES, KRISTY BRIONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AIAE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less