This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:27:03 (UTC).

JEAN FRANCES KVETON

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 JEAN FRANCES KVETON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0702

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KYLE KVETON

Decedent

JEAN FRANCES KVETON

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 03/18/19 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/18/19 - PROBATE NOTES

DECLARATION OF KYLE KVETON IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

DECLARATION OF KYLE KVETON IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

HRG OF 03/18/19 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/18/19 - PROBATE NOTES

IMPORTANT CORRESPONDENCE 12/24/18 MIN ORDER (IMAGED)

IMPORTANT CORRESPONDENCE 12/24/18 MIN ORDER (IMAGED)

HRG OF 12/24/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/24/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/24/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/24/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, KYLE KVETON APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, PATRICK B. WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, KYLE KVETON APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, PATRICK B. WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

HRG OF 10/16/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/16/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/16/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/16/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY KYLE KVETON

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY KYLE KVETON

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KYLE KVETON

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KYLE KVETON

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AIAE FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AIAE FILED.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE SANCTIONS OF $500- FAILURE TO APPEAR/FILE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER REBECCA ALLEN 13689; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY KYLE KVETON PRESENT FOR SELF.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: TO FILE ACCOUNTING; COURT TAKES OFF CALENDAR OSC RE SANCTIONS SET FOR TODAY.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/30/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/18/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/18/19 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF KYLE KVETON IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/18/19 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • IMPORTANT CORRESPONDENCE 12/24/18 MIN ORDER (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; COURT SETS OSC RE SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $500.00 FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND FAILURE TO; FILE AS TO THE ADMINISTRATOR. COURT ORDERS THE ADMINISTRATOR TO BE PERSONALLY PRESENT AT THE; NEXT HEARING IN DEPARTMENT S35 AT 8:30AM ON MARCH 18, 2019. COURT NOTES MATTER WAS CALLED AT; 8:50AM FOR AN 8:30AM HEARING AND THERE WAS NO APPEARANCE AND NO CONTACT BY ADMINISTRATOR TO; THE DEPARTMENT.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: OSC RE SANCTIONS OF $500- FAILURE TO APPEAR/FILE SET FOR 03/18/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/18/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 12/24/18 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 12/24/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 12/24/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KYLE KVETON FOR PETITION AND COURT REPORTER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0858 $465.00; 170714-0858-CK Reference Number #D3564284

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KYLE KVETON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MUST SUBMIT ORIGINAL LETTERS WITH "WET INK" SIGNATURE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AIAE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less