This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 10:46:34 (UTC).

JARROD BURGUAN -V- ADAN HERNANDEZ, ETAL

Case Summary

On 05/01/2015 JARROD BURGUAN filed a Civil Right - Firearm Right lawsuit against ADAN HERNANDEZ, ETAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0031

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Firearm Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JARROD BURGUAN,

Respondents

ADAN HERNANDEZ

ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

290 North "D" St., 3Rd Flr

San Bernardino, CA 92401

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2015
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT PACKET; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • ORDER OF FORFEITURE ON PETITION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION RE RETURN OF FIREARMS FILED; Minutes; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - OTHER MENTAL HEALTH FILED 05/01/2015 OF JARROD BURGUAN, ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • STATUS HEARING ON PETITION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: GABRIELA LEE; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JASON EWERT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ADAN HERNANDEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT FINDS:; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; THE COURT WILL GRANT REQUEST FOR DEFAULT ON THE PETITION.; PLAINTIFFS TO PREPARE ORDER FOR SIGNATURE..; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT PACKET SET FOR 07/30/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ADAN HERNANDEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/06/15 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • PARTY JARROD BURGUAN, UPDATED: CORRECTED PETITIONERS NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JARROD BURGUAN, FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $380.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON OTHER MENTAL HEALTH FILED 05/01/2015 OF JARROD BURGUAN, - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • MENTAL HEALTH CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.